This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/15/2017 at 06:51:50 (UTC).

MARIO V. GONZALEZ VS. ATCHESON'S EXPRESS, INC.

Case Summary

On 05/08/2014 MARIO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against GONZALEZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    05/08/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARIO V. GONZALEZ

Defendants

ATCHESON'S EXPRESS, LLC

ATCHESON'S EXPRESS, INC.

BRADLEY JAY ATCHESON

MARK ATCHESON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF STEVEN A. AFGHANI

LAW OFFICES OF STEVEN A. ALEXANDER

Defendant Attorney

CAROTHERS DISANTE & FREUDENBERGER LLP

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY GONZALEZ, MARIO V. ON 10/06/2014

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY GONZALEZ, MARIO V. ON 10/06/2014

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEMURRER TO ANSWER 10/02/2014 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEMURRER TO ANSWER 10/02/2014 01:30:00 PM.

NOTICE OF HEARING OC GENERATED

NOTICE OF HEARING OC GENERATED

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/16/2014 02:44:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/16/2014 02:44:00 PM.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY GONZALEZ, MARIO V. ON 09/15/2014

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY GONZALEZ, MARIO V. ON 09/15/2014

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ATCHESON, BRADLEY JAY; ATCHESON, MARK; ATCHESON'S EXPRESS, LLC ON 09/11/2014

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY ATCHESON, BRADLEY JAY; ATCHESON, MARK; ATCHESON'S EXPRESS, LLC ON 09/11/2014

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11649051 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11473142.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11649051 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11473142.

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY ATCHESON, BRADLEY JAY; ATCHESON, MARK; ATCHESON'S EXPRESS, LLC ON 08/26/2014

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY ATCHESON, BRADLEY JAY; ATCHESON, MARK; ATCHESON'S EXPRESS, LLC ON 08/26/2014

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OC GENERATED

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OC GENERATED

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/26/2014

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/26/2014

CASE REASSIGNED TO RANDALL SHERMAN EFFECTIVE 09/02/2014.

CASE REASSIGNED TO RANDALL SHERMAN EFFECTIVE 09/02/2014.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 210 - COURT REPORTING SERVICES IN CIVIL PROCEEDINGS LASTING UNDER 1 HOUR IN THE AMOUNT OF 90.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11637772 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11461888.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 210 - COURT REPORTING SERVICES IN CIVIL PROCEEDINGS LASTING UNDER 1 HOUR IN THE AMOUNT OF 90.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11637772 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11461888.

DEMURRER TO ANSWER FILED BY GONZALEZ, MARIO V. ON 08/04/2014

DEMURRER TO ANSWER FILED BY GONZALEZ, MARIO V. ON 08/04/2014

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEMURRER TO ANSWER 08/05/2014 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEMURRER TO ANSWER 08/05/2014 09:00:00 AM.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY GONZALEZ, MARIO V. ON 07/29/2014

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY GONZALEZ, MARIO V. ON 07/29/2014

AMENDED ANSWER (FIRST) FILED BY ATCHESON, BRADLEY JAY; ATCHESON, MARK; ATCHESON'S EXPRESS, LLC ON 07/23/2014

AMENDED ANSWER (FIRST) FILED BY ATCHESON, BRADLEY JAY; ATCHESON, MARK; ATCHESON'S EXPRESS, LLC ON 07/23/2014

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 210 - COURT REPORTING SERVICES IN CIVIL PROCEEDINGS LASTING UNDER 1 HOUR IN THE AMOUNT OF 90.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11622974 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11447007.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 210 - COURT REPORTING SERVICES IN CIVIL PROCEEDINGS LASTING UNDER 1 HOUR IN THE AMOUNT OF 90.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11622974 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11447007.

DEMURRER TO ANSWER FILED BY GONZALEZ, MARIO V. ON 07/08/2014

DEMURRER TO ANSWER FILED BY GONZALEZ, MARIO V. ON 07/08/2014

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2014
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY GONZALEZ, MARIO V. ON 10/06/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2014
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3198394 RECEIVED ON 10/06/2014 10:40:22 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEMURRER TO ANSWER 10/02/2014 01:30:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING OC GENERATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/16/2014 02:44:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • DocketTHE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE IS SCHEDULED FOR 11/07/2014 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C24.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2014
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 11/07/2014 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY GONZALEZ, MARIO V. ON 09/15/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 06/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO 170.6 CCP (JUDGE GEOFFREY T GLASS) FILED BY ATCHESON, BRADLEY JAY; ATCHESON, MARK; ATCHESON'S EXPRESS, LLC ON 06/19/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ATCHESON, BRADLEY JAY; ATCHESON, MARK; ATCHESON'S EXPRESS, LLC ON 06/19/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2014
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2344286 RECEIVED ON 06/19/2014 03:33:29 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/22/2014 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C32 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GLASS, GEOFFREY ON 05/08/2014.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11591594 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11415626.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GONZALEZ, MARIO V. ON 05/08/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GONZALEZ, MARIO V. ON 05/08/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY GONZALEZ, MARIO V. ON 05/08/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2014
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3143240 RECEIVED ON 05/08/2014 04:24:56 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ATCHISON EXPRESS is a litigant