This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 03:29:19 (UTC).

MARIO CASTELUM VS. BLUE GOLD, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 MARIO CASTELUM filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BLUE GOLD, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civil Complex Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARIO CASTELUM

Defendants

BLUE GOLD, INC.

PC FLAGSHIP, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF TODD M. FRIEDMAN,PC

Defendant Attorney

RAINES FELDMAN LLP

 

Court Documents

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION FILED BY BLUE GOLD, INC. ON 12/15/2017

MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION FILED BY BLUE GOLD, INC. ON 12/15/2017

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/17/2018 02:05:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/17/2018 02:05:00 PM.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/17/2019

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/17/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CASTELUM, MARIO ON 10/10/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CASTELUM, MARIO ON 10/10/2017

STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT (RE: ARBITRATION) FILED BY PC FLAGSHIP, LLC ON 10/10/2018

STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT (RE: ARBITRATION) FILED BY PC FLAGSHIP, LLC ON 10/10/2018

STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT (RE ARBITRATION) FILED BY CASTELUM, MARIO ON 04/06/2018

STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT (RE ARBITRATION) FILED BY CASTELUM, MARIO ON 04/06/2018

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1450522 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1450522 REJECTED.

COMPLAINT FILED BY CASTELUM, MARIO ON 10/10/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY CASTELUM, MARIO ON 10/10/2017

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/04/2018

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/04/2018

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY BLUE GOLD, INC. ON 12/15/2017

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY BLUE GOLD, INC. ON 12/15/2017

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY CASTELUM, MARIO ON 11/09/2017

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY CASTELUM, MARIO ON 11/09/2017

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2017-10-26 10:45:00.0.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2017-10-26 10:45:00.0.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CASTELUM, MARIO ON 11/09/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CASTELUM, MARIO ON 11/09/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CASTELUM, MARIO ON 10/10/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CASTELUM, MARIO ON 10/10/2017

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1457696 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1457696 REJECTED.

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2019
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER - OTHER (OF DISMISSAL) FILED BY CASTELUM, MARIO ON 04/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3781801 RECEIVED ON 04/17/2019 10:17:50 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4959697 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ADR REVIEW HEARING 04/17/2019 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 05/29/2019 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT CX104.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 05/29/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN CX104 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 10/26/2017
  • THE COURT DEEMS THIS CASE EXCEPTIONAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/24/2018 AT 08:30:00 AM IN CX102 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ERRATA FILED BY CASTELUM, MARIO ON 10/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3598537 RECEIVED ON 10/18/2017 10:19:16 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CLASTER, WILLIAM ON 10/10/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12235294 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12058974.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CASTELUM, MARIO ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CASTELUM, MARIO ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY CASTELUM, MARIO ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2600451 RECEIVED ON 10/07/2017 05:26:51 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.