This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/07/2019 at 08:22:42 (UTC).

MARINA REISLER VS KEVIN REISLER

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 MARINA REISLER filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against KEVIN REISLER. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MELZER, LAYNE H. and COOPER, SCOTT B.. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1698

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

Judges

MELZER, LAYNE H.

COOPER, SCOTT B.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

REISLER, MARINA ALDAVE

Claimant

SOUTHWEST CARPENTERS PENSION TRUST

Respondent

REISLER, KEVIN BRIAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ROGERS MACLEITH & STOLP, LLP

Respondent Attorney

NOGUEIRAS, MARITA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2019
  • TRIAL - LONG CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • TRIAL - LONG CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • MINUTE ORDER 12/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • EXHIBIT LIST - COURT 12/03/2018 Exhibit List - Court; Filing Party: REISLER, KEVIN BRIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • TRIAL - HEARING BRIEF 12/03/2018 Trial - Hearing Brief; Filing Party: REISLER, KEVIN BRIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • MINUTE ORDER 09/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • TRIAL - LONG CAUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • NOTICE - HEARING / CONTINUANCE 08/29/2018 Hrg set on 9/5 cont to 12/13 due to court unavailable

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • ORDER - STANDING ORDERS 08/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • MINUTE ORDER 08/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2016
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 02/26/2016; Filing Party: REISLER, MARINA ALDAVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • RFO - CUSTODY / VISITATION / CHILD SUPPORT / SPOUSAL SUPPORT 02/26/2016 Amount:$60.00; Filing Party: REISLER, MARINA ALDAVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PROPERTY DECLARATION - COMMUNITY 02/26/2016; Filing Party: REISLER, MARINA ALDAVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 02/26/2016; Filing Party: REISLER, MARINA ALDAVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 02/26/2016; Filing Party: REISLER, MARINA ALDAVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SUMMONS 02/26/2016; Filing Party: REISLER, MARINA ALDAVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 02/26/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: REISLER, MARINA ALDAVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • ORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY CLERK 02/26/2016; Filing Party: REISLER, MARINA ALDAVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • REQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 02/26/2016; Filing Party: REISLER, MARINA ALDAVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • ORDER - ATTEND PARENT EDUCATION / MEDIATION APPOINTMENT 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.