This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/25/2019 at 12:12:12 (UTC).

MARIANO V MARIANO

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 MARIANO filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MARIANO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7539

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Santiago T. Mariano

Petitioner

MARIANO, SANTIAGO TORRES

Defendant

Maria L. Mariano

Respondent

MARIANO, MARIA LOURDES O.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2014
  • MINUTE ORDER - OFF CALENDAR 04/15/2014 09:30:00 # Pages:1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • CONFERENCE - STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 04/10/2014 15:41:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: MARIANO, SANTIAGO TORRES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 04/10/2014 15:37:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: MARIANO, SANTIAGO TORRES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • JUDGMENT 04/10/2014 15:37:00 # Pages:8; Filing Party: MARIANO, SANTIAGO TORRES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2014
  • JUDGMENT - FAMILY CODE 2336 04/10/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 04/08/2014 14:57:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: MARIANO, SANTIAGO TORRES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • NOTICE - STATUS CONFERENCE 03/20/2014 12:48:00 GENERATED BY 240 DAY CHECKPOINT CONFERENCE NOTICE # Pages:1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 03/03/2014 15:23:00 # Pages:3; Filing Party: MARIANO, SANTIAGO TORRES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2014
  • WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 03/03/2014 15:22:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: MARIANO, SANTIAGO TORRES

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2014
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 03/03/2014 15:21:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: MARIANO, SANTIAGO TORRES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • CONFERENCE - PROCEDURAL ASSISTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2013
  • NOTICE - PROCEDURAL ASSISTANCE CONFERENCE 12/18/2013 14:34:00 GENERATED BY THE 100 - 120 DAY PROCEDURAL ASSISTANCE CONFERENCE NOTICE # Pages:1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2013
  • NOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT 11/08/2013 13:50:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: MARIANO, SANTIAGO TORRES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 11/08/2013 10:18:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: MARIANO, SANTIAGO TORRES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 08/12/2013 11:18:00 # Pages:3; Filing Party: MARIANO, SANTIAGO TORRES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • SUMMONS 08/12/2013 11:18:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: MARIANO, SANTIAGO TORRES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 08/12/2013 11:18:00 # Pages:3; Filing Party: MARIANO, SANTIAGO TORRES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 08/12/2013 11:19:00 # Pages:4; Filing Party: MARIANO, SANTIAGO TORRES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 08/12/2013 11:18:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: MARIANO, SANTIAGO TORRES

    Read MoreRead Less