This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/11/2019 at 05:30:41 (UTC).

MARIA PILAR SOTO VS. DON VICTOR BRAVO, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/21/2018 MARIA PILAR SOTO filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against DON VICTOR BRAVO, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARIA PILAR SOTO

Defendants

DON VICTOR BRAVO, LLC

Cora Bonilla

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAMI LAW, PC

Defendant Attorneys

JEFFREY T OSBORN

ROGER J. PLASSE

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY SOTO, MARIA PILAR ON 03/21/2018

COMPLAINT FILED BY SOTO, MARIA PILAR ON 03/21/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SOTO, MARIA PILAR ON 03/21/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SOTO, MARIA PILAR ON 03/21/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12319593 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12143363.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12319593 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12143363.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEWIS, GREGORY ON 03/21/2018.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEWIS, GREGORY ON 03/21/2018.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SOTO, MARIA PILAR ON 03/22/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SOTO, MARIA PILAR ON 03/22/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SOTO, MARIA PILAR ON 04/02/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SOTO, MARIA PILAR ON 04/02/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/13/2018 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/13/2018 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DON VICTOR BRAVO, LLC ON 04/26/2018

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY DON VICTOR BRAVO, LLC ON 04/26/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12340282 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12164012.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12340282 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12164012.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DON VICTOR BRAVO, LLC ON 07/30/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DON VICTOR BRAVO, LLC ON 07/30/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SOTO, MARIA PILAR ON 07/30/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SOTO, MARIA PILAR ON 07/30/2018

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 1) FILED BY SOTO, MARIA PILAR ON 08/09/2018

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 1) FILED BY SOTO, MARIA PILAR ON 08/09/2018

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY SOTO, MARIA PILAR ON 08/13/2018

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY SOTO, MARIA PILAR ON 08/13/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12400930 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12224623.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12400930 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12224623.

NOTICE OF TRIAL FILED BY DON VICTOR BRAVO, LLC ON 08/15/2018

NOTICE OF TRIAL FILED BY DON VICTOR BRAVO, LLC ON 08/15/2018

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 08/13/2018 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 08/13/2018 08:30:00 AM.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY SOTO, MARIA PILAR ON 01/04/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY SOTO, MARIA PILAR ON 01/04/2019

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2019
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY SOTO, MARIA PILAR ON 01/04/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4923303 RECEIVED ON 01/04/2019 04:18:27 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 08/13/2018 08:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketTHE JURY TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 03/18/2019 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT C26.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketTHE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 03/07/2019 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C26.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 03/18/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketMANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/07/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TRIAL FILED BY DON VICTOR BRAVO, LLC ON 08/15/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/13/2018 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SOTO, MARIA PILAR ON 04/02/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/02/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3652185 RECEIVED ON 03/31/2018 02:16:52 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SOTO, MARIA PILAR ON 03/22/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4827915 RECEIVED ON 03/22/2018 01:17:54 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEWIS, GREGORY ON 03/21/2018.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY E-FILINGSOFAMERICA FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12319593 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12143363.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SOTO, MARIA PILAR ON 03/21/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY SOTO, MARIA PILAR ON 03/21/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2652801 RECEIVED ON 03/21/2018 05:50:05 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less