This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 07/08/2022 at 04:43:33 (UTC).

MARIA MEZA BAILON VS. VALLARTA FOOD ENTERPRISES, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/14/2022 MARIA MEZA BAILON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against VALLARTA FOOD ENTERPRISES, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maria Meza Bailon

Defendant

Vallarta Food Enterprises, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mendez & Sanchez, A.P.C.

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/17/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/17/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13062679 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12890676.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13062679 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12890676.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MEZA BAILON, MARIA ON 06/14/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MEZA BAILON, MARIA ON 06/14/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MEZA BAILON, MARIA ON 06/14/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MEZA BAILON, MARIA ON 06/14/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY MEZA BAILON, MARIA ON 06/14/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY MEZA BAILON, MARIA ON 06/14/2022

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/20/2022 09:40:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/20/2022 09:40:00 AM.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: MCCORMICK; Department: C13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/06/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketTHE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CURRENTLY SET ON 11/17/2022 IS ORDERED ADVANCED TO 10/06/2022 AT 09:00 AM IN C13.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/20/2022 09:40:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11000452 RECEIVED ON 06/14/2022 12:05:14 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY MEZA BAILON, MARIA ON 06/14/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MEZA BAILON, MARIA ON 06/14/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MEZA BAILON, MARIA ON 06/14/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13062679 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12890676.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MCCORMICK, MELISSA ON 06/14/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/17/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VALLARTA FOOD ENTERPRISES INC. is a litigant