This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/08/2019 at 10:36:26 (UTC).

MARIA MAYORGA VS RODRIGO MAYORGA

Case Summary

On 07/26/2016 MARIA MAYORGA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against RODRIGO MAYORGA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****6414

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MAYORGA, MARIA

Respondent

MAYORGA, RODRIGO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

PRICHARD, DONALD L.

Respondent Attorney

CASTELLANOS & ASSOCIATES, APLC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2018
  • CONFERENCE - CASE RESOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • NOTICE - CASE RESOLUTION CONFERENCE - UNASSIGNED 11/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • CONFERENCE - STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY 07/25/2017; Filing Party: MAYORGA, RODRIGO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY 07/25/2017; Filing Party: MAYORGA, MARIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • RETURN SHEET - CLERKS OFFICE 07/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • STIPULATION - COURT APPOINTED TEMPORARY JUDGE 07/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • MINUTE ORDER 07/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CONFERENCE - STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • RETURN SHEET - CLERKS OFFICE 06/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • NOTICE - OTHER 06/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • NOTICE - STATUS CONFERENCE - UNASSIGNED 06/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2017
  • RETURN SHEET - CLERKS OFFICE 03/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 09/02/2016; Filing Party: MAYORGA, RODRIGO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 09/02/2016; Filing Party: MAYORGA, RODRIGO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 09/02/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: MAYORGA, RODRIGO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • SUMMONS 07/26/2016; Filing Party: MAYORGA, MARIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 07/26/2016; Filing Party: MAYORGA, MARIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 07/26/2016; Filing Party: MAYORGA, MARIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 07/26/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: MAYORGA, MARIA

    Read MoreRead Less