This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 03:26:14 (UTC).

MARIA KNIGHT VS. APRIL SAMPSON

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 MARIA KNIGHT filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against APRIL SAMPSON. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARIA KNIGHT

Defendant

APRIL SAMPSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE CHANG FIRM

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY KNIGHT, MARIA ON 11/20/2017

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY KNIGHT, MARIA ON 11/20/2017

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KNIGHT, MARIA ON 10/10/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KNIGHT, MARIA ON 10/10/2017

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY KNIGHT, MARIA ON 11/15/2017

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY KNIGHT, MARIA ON 11/15/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KNIGHT, MARIA ON 10/10/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KNIGHT, MARIA ON 10/10/2017

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 12/08/2017 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C61 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 12/08/2017 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C61 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/17/17) RECEIVED ON 11/16/2017.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/17/17) RECEIVED ON 11/16/2017.

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 10/18/2017.

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 10/18/2017.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12240133 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12063813.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12240133 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12063813.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KNIGHT, MARIA ON 11/15/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY KNIGHT, MARIA ON 11/15/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234035 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057717.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234035 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057717.

COMPLAINT FILED BY KNIGHT, MARIA ON 10/10/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY KNIGHT, MARIA ON 10/10/2017

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

WRIT (11/22/2017 ISSUED) RECEIVED ON 11/20/2017.

WRIT (11/22/2017 ISSUED) RECEIVED ON 11/20/2017.

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY KNIGHT, MARIA ON 12/19/2017

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY KNIGHT, MARIA ON 12/19/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12257530 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12081252.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12257530 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12081252.

ORDER - OTHER (TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING) FILED BY KNIGHT, MARIA ON 10/20/2017

ORDER - OTHER (TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING) FILED BY KNIGHT, MARIA ON 10/20/2017

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY KNIGHT, MARIA ON 12/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12257530 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12081252.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (11/22/2017 ISSUED) RECEIVED ON 11/20/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY KNIGHT, MARIA ON 11/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2614143 RECEIVED ON 11/20/2017 11:50:28 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/17/17) RECEIVED ON 11/16/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3608572 RECEIVED ON 11/16/2017 02:26:46 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY KNIGHT, MARIA ON 11/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER - OTHER (TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING) FILED BY KNIGHT, MARIA ON 10/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12240133 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12063813.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 10/18/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4778844 RECEIVED ON 10/18/2017 02:01:10 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234035 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057717.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KNIGHT, MARIA ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KNIGHT, MARIA ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY KNIGHT, MARIA ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2601034 RECEIVED ON 10/10/2017 02:19:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.