This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/09/2019 at 02:04:42 (UTC).

MARIA CENTENO VS. WL HOMES LLC

Case Summary

On 04/25/2017 MARIA CENTENO filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against WL HOMES LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Courthouse:

    Civil Complex Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANDREA PAUL

NICK PAPPAS

VALERIE HARDMAN

MARTIN PIKUL

YASUHIKO HAMADA

KENNETH CHUNG

MARIA CENTENO

YUMIKO HAMADA

PAOLO GALANG

ZECHENG JU

SHIH TUO TANG

KAYLEEN NEWBY

FAN XIANG

JOSEPH KANE

QUAN VU

LORI VU

LIYA GU

MABEL CALLEJA

Defendant and Other

WL HOMES LLC

Cross Defendant

REGAL CULTURED MARBLE, INC

68 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GELFER LAW GROUP

Defendant and Other Attorneys

BOORNAZIAN, JENSEN & GARTHE

LEE, HERNANDEZ, LANDRUM & GAROFALO

MARTUCCI & ASSCOCIATES

Wolfe & Wyman LLP

Other Attorneys

DIEDERICH & ASSOCIATES

MOKRI VANIS & JONES LLP

ORLAND LAW GROUP

FREDRICKSON MAZEIKA & GRANT

HUGO PARKER LLP

LEE, HERNANDEZ, LANDRUM & CARLSON, APC

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 02/06/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 02/06/2019

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 01/30/2019

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 01/30/2019

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 12/06/2018 02:00:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 12/06/2018 02:00:00 PM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12460939 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12284607.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12460939 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12284607.

NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 11/20/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 11/20/2018

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 10/18/2018

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 10/18/2018

MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 10/18/2018

MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 10/18/2018

APPLICATION - OTHER (FOR ORDER ALLOWING SERVICE THROUGH SECRETARY OF STATE) FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 09/24/2018

APPLICATION - OTHER (FOR ORDER ALLOWING SERVICE THROUGH SECRETARY OF STATE) FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 09/24/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 01/05/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 01/05/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 01/05/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 01/05/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 01/05/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 01/05/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12257154 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12080876.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12257154 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12080876.

ORDER - OTHER (GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ORDER ALLOWING SERVICE THROUGH THE CALIFORNIA SECRETARY OF STATE) FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 11/17/2017

ORDER - OTHER (GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ORDER ALLOWING SERVICE THROUGH THE CALIFORNIA SECRETARY OF STATE) FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 11/17/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12255314 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12079049.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12255314 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12079049.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/13/2017 03:36:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/13/2017 03:36:00 PM.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 07/06/2017

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 07/06/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY CENTENO, MARIA; CALLEJA, MABEL; CHUNG, KENNETH; GALANG, PAOLO; HAMADA, YASUHIKO; HAMADA, YUMIKO; HARDMAN, VALERIE; JU, ZECHENG; NEWBY, KAYLEEN; KANE, JOSEPH;OTHERS ON 04/25/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY CENTENO, MARIA; CALLEJA, MABEL; CHUNG, KENNETH; GALANG, PAOLO; HAMADA, YASUHIKO; HAMADA, YUMIKO; HARDMAN, VALERIE; JU, ZECHENG; NEWBY, KAYLEEN; KANE, JOSEPH;OTHERS ON 04/25/2017

219 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER (OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTY) FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 08/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3820998 RECEIVED ON 08/07/2019 11:18:04 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 08/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1650981 RECEIVED ON 08/01/2019 06:31:15 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12560172 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12384051.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE) FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 05/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4973226 RECEIVED ON 05/24/2019 11:30:30 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/04/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN CX102 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 05/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2798423 RECEIVED ON 05/24/2019 11:30:27 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
322 More Docket Entries
  • 06/06/2017
  • THE STATUS CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 08/02/2017 AT 10:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT CX104.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/02/2017 AT 10:00:00 AM IN CX104 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PAUL, ANDREA; XIANG, FAN; KANE, JOSEPH; NEWBY, KAYLEEN; CHUNG, KENNETH; GU, LIYA; VU, LORI; CALLEJA, MABEL; CENTENO, MARIA; PIKUL, MARTIN;OTHERS ON 05/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1384690 RECEIVED ON 05/12/2017 01:56:43 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER DUNNING, KIM ON 04/25/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12145970 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11969770.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CENTENO, MARIA; CALLEJA, MABEL; CHUNG, KENNETH; GALANG, PAOLO; HAMADA, YASUHIKO; HAMADA, YUMIKO; HARDMAN, VALERIE; JU, ZECHENG; NEWBY, KAYLEEN; KANE, JOSEPH;OTHERS ON 04/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CENTENO, MARIA; CALLEJA, MABEL; CHUNG, KENNETH; GALANG, PAOLO; HAMADA, YASUHIKO; HAMADA, YUMIKO; HARDMAN, VALERIE; JU, ZECHENG; NEWBY, KAYLEEN; KANE, JOSEPH;OTHERS ON 04/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY CENTENO, MARIA; CALLEJA, MABEL; CHUNG, KENNETH; GALANG, PAOLO; HAMADA, YASUHIKO; HAMADA, YUMIKO; HARDMAN, VALERIE; JU, ZECHENG; NEWBY, KAYLEEN; KANE, JOSEPH;OTHERS ON 04/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4714320 RECEIVED ON 04/25/2017 02:33:17 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WL HOMES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where REGAL CULTURED MARBLE, INC is a litigant