This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/30/2022 at 03:40:43 (UTC).

MARGARITA LOPEZ CASTRO VS. ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC

Case Summary

On 06/17/2022 MARGARITA LOPEZ CASTRO filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against ENDO INTERNATIONAL PLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Margarita Lopez Castro

Defendants

Anchen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Endo International PLC

Endo Pharmaceuticals

PAR Pharmaceuticals

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAMES HAWKINS APLC

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LOPEZ CASTRO, MARGARITA ON 06/22/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LOPEZ CASTRO, MARGARITA ON 06/22/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13065291 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12893284.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13065291 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12893284.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LOPEZ CASTRO, MARGARITA ON 06/17/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LOPEZ CASTRO, MARGARITA ON 06/17/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY LOPEZ CASTRO, MARGARITA ON 06/17/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY LOPEZ CASTRO, MARGARITA ON 06/17/2022

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/03/2022 02:57:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/03/2022 02:57:00 PM.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2022
  • HearingDescription: STATUS CONFERENCE; Judge: WILSON; Department: CX102

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/03/2022 02:57:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketSTATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 11/04/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN CX102 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • DocketTHE STATUS CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 11/04/2022 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT CX102.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21174717 RECEIVED ON 06/22/2022 05:08:50 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LOPEZ CASTRO, MARGARITA ON 06/22/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11002416 RECEIVED ON 06/17/2022 05:58:33 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13065291 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12893284.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY LOPEZ CASTRO, MARGARITA ON 06/17/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LOPEZ CASTRO, MARGARITA ON 06/17/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER WILSON, PETER ON 06/17/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Anchen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Par Pharmaceutical Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where Endo International Plc is a litigant

Latest cases where Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc is a litigant