This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/12/2022 at 08:22:36 (UTC).

MARCIA TUCKER VS HOWARD TUCKER

Case Summary

On 05/19/2016 MARCIA TUCKER filed a Family - Legal Separation lawsuit against HOWARD TUCKER. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VU, NATHAN. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****4422

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Legal Separation

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

Judge

VU, NATHAN

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TUCKER, MARCIA J

Claimants

UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA RETIREMENT SAVINGS PROGRAM

UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA DEFINED CONTRIBUTION PLAN

Respondent

TUCKER, HOWARD G

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

SCHUCHERT, KRIEGER & KLAUSNER LLP

KLAUSNER JOHNSON LLP

 

Court Documents

PETITION - DISSOLUTION 05/19/2016 Amount:$435.00

PETITION - DISSOLUTION 05/19/2016 Amount:$435.00

SUMMONS 05/19/2016

SUMMONS 05/19/2016

NOTICE - RELATED CASE 05/19/2016

NOTICE - RELATED CASE 05/19/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 06/13/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 06/13/2016

RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 06/17/2016 Amount:$435.00

RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 06/17/2016 Amount:$435.00

NOTICE - RELATED CASE 06/17/2016

NOTICE - RELATED CASE 06/17/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE - CIVIL 06/17/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE - CIVIL 06/17/2016

RETURN SHEET - CLERKS OFFICE 07/19/2016

RETURN SHEET - CLERKS OFFICE 07/19/2016

MOTION - DISQUALIFY 07/22/2016 Amount:$60.00

MOTION - DISQUALIFY 07/22/2016 Amount:$60.00

INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 07/22/2016

INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 07/22/2016

NOTICE - RELATED CASE 07/22/2016

NOTICE - RELATED CASE 07/22/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL (CIVIL) 07/26/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL (CIVIL) 07/26/2016

NOTICE - OTHER 07/26/2016 Intent to Seek Sanctions

NOTICE - OTHER 07/26/2016 Intent to Seek Sanctions

ORDER - TEMPORARY EMERGENCY (EX PARTE) - DENIED 08/05/2016

ORDER - TEMPORARY EMERGENCY (EX PARTE) - DENIED 08/05/2016

MOTION - CONTINUE / ADVANCE 08/05/2016 Amount:$60.00

MOTION - CONTINUE / ADVANCE 08/05/2016 Amount:$60.00

NOTICE - RELATED CASE 08/05/2016

NOTICE - RELATED CASE 08/05/2016

OPPOSITION 08/05/2016 to Ex-Parte

OPPOSITION 08/05/2016 to Ex-Parte

OPPOSITION 09/26/2016 to ex-parte

OPPOSITION 09/26/2016 to ex-parte

127 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY 08/30/2019 Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record; Filing Party: TUCKER, HOWARD G

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 05/30/2019; Filing Party: TUCKER, HOWARD G

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - RESERVED ISSUES 05/30/2019; Filing Party: TUCKER, HOWARD G

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketJUDGMENT - RESERVED ISSUES STIPULATED 05/30/2019 Judge:VU, NATHAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • HearingDescription: CONFERENCE - STATUS; Department: L67

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO OR LEGAL SEP 05/02/2019; Filing Party: TUCKER, MARCIA J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION & WAIVERS (NO FEE) 05/02/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 05/02/2019; Filing Party: TUCKER, MARCIA J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION & WAIVERS (NO FEE) 05/02/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER 05/02/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
183 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 07/22/2016; Filing Party: TUCKER, MARCIA J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION - DISQUALIFY 07/22/2016 Amount:$60.00; Filing Party: TUCKER, MARCIA J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN SHEET - CLERKS OFFICE 07/19/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - CIVIL 06/17/2016; Filing Party: TUCKER, HOWARD G

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - RELATED CASE 06/17/2016; Filing Party: TUCKER, HOWARD G

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 06/17/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: TUCKER, HOWARD G

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 06/13/2016; Filing Party: TUCKER, MARCIA J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - RELATED CASE 05/19/2016; Filing Party: TUCKER, MARCIA J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS 05/19/2016; Filing Party: TUCKER, MARCIA J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION - DISSOLUTION 05/19/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: TUCKER, MARCIA J

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less