This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/27/2022 at 04:37:34 (UTC).

MARC VAN ALPHEN VS LISA VAN ALPHEN

Case Summary

On 06/19/2020 MARC VAN ALPHEN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LISA VAN ALPHEN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3567

  • Filing Date:

    06/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Van Alphen, Marc

Respondent

Van Alphen, Lisa

 

Court Documents

WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY 12/17/2020

WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY 12/17/2020

NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 10/22/2020

NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 10/22/2020

JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 10/22/2020

JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 10/22/2020

DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO OR LEGAL SEP 10/22/2020

DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO OR LEGAL SEP 10/22/2020

WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 10/22/2020

WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 10/22/2020

DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 10/22/2020

DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 10/22/2020

DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 10/22/2020

DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 10/22/2020

APPEARANCE, STIPULATION & WAIVERS (FEE) 07/28/2020 Amount:$435.00

APPEARANCE, STIPULATION & WAIVERS (FEE) 07/28/2020 Amount:$435.00

NOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT 07/06/2020

NOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT 07/06/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 07/06/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 07/06/2020

DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 06/19/2020 Declaration - Uniform Custody

DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 06/19/2020 Declaration - Uniform Custody

PETITION - DISSOLUTION 06/19/2020 Petition - Dissolution / Legal Separation / Nullity

PETITION - DISSOLUTION 06/19/2020 Petition - Dissolution / Legal Separation / Nullity

SUMMONS 06/19/2020 Summons

SUMMONS 06/19/2020 Summons

NOTICE - RELATED CASE - UPDATE PARTY 06/19/2020 Notice - Related Case

NOTICE - RELATED CASE - UPDATE PARTY 06/19/2020 Notice - Related Case

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY 12/17/2020; Filing Party: VAN ALPHEN, MARC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketJUDGMENT - FAMILY CODE 2336 10/22/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 10/22/2020; Filing Party: VAN ALPHEN, MARC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 10/22/2020; Filing Party: VAN ALPHEN, LISA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 10/22/2020; Filing Party: VAN ALPHEN, MARC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSO OR LEGAL SEP 10/22/2020; Filing Party: VAN ALPHEN, MARC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 10/22/2020; Filing Party: VAN ALPHEN, MARC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 10/22/2020; Filing Party: VAN ALPHEN, MARC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPEARANCE, STIPULATION & WAIVERS (FEE) 07/28/2020 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: VAN ALPHEN, MARC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 07/06/2020; Filing Party: VAN ALPHEN, MARC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT 07/06/2020; Filing Party: VAN ALPHEN, MARC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - RELATED CASE - UPDATE PARTY 06/19/2020 Notice - Related Case; Filing Party: VAN ALPHEN, MARC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS 06/19/2020 Summons; Filing Party: VAN ALPHEN, MARC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION - DISSOLUTION 06/19/2020 Petition - Dissolution / Legal Separation / Nullity; Filing Party: VAN ALPHEN, MARC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 06/19/2020 Declaration - Uniform Custody; Filing Party: VAN ALPHEN, MARC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less