This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/11/2019 at 11:22:41 (UTC).

MARC HASCHEFF VS. SBB ROOFING INC.

Case Summary

On 05/24/2018 MARC HASCHEFF filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SBB ROOFING INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARC HASCHEFF

Defendant and Other

SBB ROOFING INC.

Cross Defendant

KEVIN SCHEID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DENNIS J. STAHL

Defendant and Other Attorney

TRACHTMAN & TRACHTMAN, LLP

 

Court Documents

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1627761 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1627761 REJECTED.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SBB ROOFING INC. ON 05/29/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SBB ROOFING INC. ON 05/29/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SBB ROOFING INC. ON 05/29/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SBB ROOFING INC. ON 05/29/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY SBB ROOFING INC. ON 05/28/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY SBB ROOFING INC. ON 05/28/2019

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/28/2019 02:59:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/28/2019 02:59:00 PM.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (WITH PREJUDICE CROSS-COMPLAINT) FILED BY SBB ROOFING INC. ON 05/28/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL (WITH PREJUDICE CROSS-COMPLAINT) FILED BY SBB ROOFING INC. ON 05/28/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY EFFICIENTLEGALSUPPORT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12552270 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12376149.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY EFFICIENTLEGALSUPPORT FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12552270 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12376149.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/06/2019.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/06/2019.

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND FILED BY HASCHEFF, MARC ON 05/06/2019

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND FILED BY HASCHEFF, MARC ON 05/06/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY HASCHEFF, MARC ON 05/07/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY HASCHEFF, MARC ON 05/07/2019

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/13/2018 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/13/2018 09:00:00 AM.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY HASCHEFF, MARC ON 08/29/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY HASCHEFF, MARC ON 08/29/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY HASCHEFF, MARC ON 08/29/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY HASCHEFF, MARC ON 08/29/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12410385 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12234095.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12410385 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12234095.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY SBB ROOFING INC. ON 08/28/2018

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY SBB ROOFING INC. ON 08/28/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SBB ROOFING INC. ON 08/28/2018

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SBB ROOFING INC. ON 08/28/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SBB ROOFING INC. ON 08/15/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY SBB ROOFING INC. ON 08/15/2018

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1627761 REJECTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SBB ROOFING INC. ON 05/29/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SBB ROOFING INC. ON 05/29/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1627958 RECEIVED ON 05/29/2019 12:02:22 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY SBB ROOFING INC. ON 05/28/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2799165 RECEIVED ON 05/28/2019 03:21:38 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/28/2019 02:59:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY SBB ROOFING INC. ON 07/09/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY SBB ROOFING INC. ON 07/09/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1517228 RECEIVED ON 07/09/2018 01:42:42 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/13/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HASCHEFF, MARC ON 05/29/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4850198 RECEIVED ON 05/29/2018 10:41:37 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MCCORMICK, MELISSA ON 05/24/2018.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12356956 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12180696.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY HASCHEFF, MARC ON 05/24/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1502933 RECEIVED ON 05/24/2018 02:36:41 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SBB ROOFING INC. AKA BILT WELL ROOF AND MATERIAL CO A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STAHL DENNIS J