This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/30/2023 at 07:29:49 (UTC).

MANUAL DURAN VS. HOME DEPOT

Case Summary

On 01/20/2023 MANUAL DURAN filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against HOME DEPOT. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Manual Duran Jr

MANUAL DURAN

Defendants

Home Depot

Home Depot 6643

Home Depot USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Copete Law Firm

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY DURAN, MANUAL JR ON 01/20/2023

COMPLAINT FILED BY DURAN, MANUAL JR ON 01/20/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DURAN, MANUAL JR ON 01/20/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DURAN, MANUAL JR ON 01/20/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DURAN, MANUAL JR ON 01/20/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DURAN, MANUAL JR ON 01/20/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13168752 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12996858.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13168752 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12996858.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/29/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/29/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/25/2023 07:27:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/25/2023 07:27:00 AM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2023
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: MCCORMICK; Department: C13

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/25/2023 07:27:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketTHE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CURRENTLY SET ON 06/29/2023 IS ORDERED ADVANCED TO 04/20/2023 AT 09:00 AM IN C13.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/29/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13168752 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12996858.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11091032 RECEIVED ON 01/20/2023 08:58:04 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MCCORMICK, MELISSA ON 01/20/2023.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DURAN, MANUAL JR ON 01/20/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DURAN, MANUAL JR ON 01/20/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY DURAN, MANUAL JR ON 01/20/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less