This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2017 at 05:21:46 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS. JOSEPH MCMANMON

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOSEPH MCMANMON. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

JOSEPH MCMANMON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HUNT & HENRIQUES, ATTORNEY AT LAW

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 10/23/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 10/23/2013

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 1/16/14) RECEIVED ON 01/14/2014.

ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 1/16/14) RECEIVED ON 01/14/2014.

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 12/18/2014

WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 12/18/2014

COMPLAINT FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

COMPLAINT FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

JUDGMENT FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 12/06/2013

JUDGMENT FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 12/06/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11528245 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11352050.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11528245 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11352050.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 12/06/2013

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 12/06/2013

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 12/06/2013

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 12/06/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11579881 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11403866.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11579881 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11403866.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 04/19/14) RECEIVED ON 04/15/2014.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 04/19/14) RECEIVED ON 04/15/2014.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 04/15/2014

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 04/15/2014

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION RETURNED - UNSATISFIED FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 12/18/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11579881 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11403866.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED ON 04/19/14) RECEIVED ON 04/15/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - LESS THAN $100 FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 04/15/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4175154 RECEIVED ON 04/15/2014 02:40:57 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11528245 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11352050.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 1/16/14) RECEIVED ON 01/14/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4130776 RECEIVED ON 01/14/2014 11:38:48 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2013
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2013
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 12/06/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 12/06/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1130558 RECEIVED ON 12/06/2013 10:14:45 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 10/23/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 374134 RECEIVED ON 10/23/2013 09:41:18 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY LVNV FUNDING LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 462337 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 11:30:59 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less