This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/25/2019 at 12:11:04 (UTC).

LUTZ V LUTZ

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 LUTZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against LUTZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****7501

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Karen Lutz

Petitioner

LUTZ, KAREN

Defendant

James Lutz

Respondent

LUTZ, JAMES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Joseph R. Terrazas Iii

Respondent Attorney

TERRAZAS III, JOSEPH ROBERT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2014
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION - RESTORATION FORMER NAME 07/17/2014 14:42:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: LUTZ, KAREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2014
  • WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY 03/14/2014 12:15:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: LUTZ, KAREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 03/07/2014 14:11:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: LUTZ, KAREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • APPEARANCE, STIPULATION & WAIVERS (CONVERSION) 03/07/2014 14:11:00 # Pages:3; Filing Party: LUTZ, KAREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 03/07/2014 14:10:00 # Pages:3; Filing Party: LUTZ, KAREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 03/07/2014 14:09:00 # Pages:4; Filing Party: LUTZ, KAREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • JUDGMENT 03/07/2014 14:09:00 # Pages:34; Filing Party: LUTZ, KAREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2014
  • JUDGMENT - FAMILY CODE 2336 03/07/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2013
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 11/07/2013 14:20:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: LUTZ, KAREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2013
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 11/06/2013 10:43:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: LUTZ, JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 08/27/2013 09:00:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: LUTZ, JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 08/27/2013 09:00:00 # Pages:3; Filing Party: LUTZ, JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2013
  • RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 08/27/2013 11:42:00 # Pages:4; Filing Party: LUTZ, JAMES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • NOTICE & ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT 08/16/2013 08:57:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: LUTZ, KAREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 08/12/2013 12:00:00 # Pages:3; Filing Party: LUTZ, KAREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 08/12/2013 11:58:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: LUTZ, KAREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • SUMMONS 08/12/2013 13:32:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: LUTZ, KAREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 08/12/2013 11:58:00 # Pages:4; Filing Party: LUTZ, KAREN

    Read MoreRead Less