This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/12/2019 at 11:32:57 (UTC).

LUOT T. TRAN VS. CHRISTOPHER SALEM, D.O.

Case Summary

On 08/20/2018 LUOT T TRAN filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against CHRISTOPHER SALEM, D O. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

LOAN T. TRAN

KHANH N. TRAN

MICHAEL N. TRAN

HA T. TRAN

HAI N. TRAN

HOI N. TRAN

LUOT T. TRAN

Defendants

CHRISTOPHER SALEM, D.O.

COUNTRY VILLA PLAZA, L.P.

DAVID N. PHAM, M.D., INC.

SOUTH COAST GLOBAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.

FOUNTAIN VALLEY REGIONAL HOSPITAL AND MEDICAL CENTER

KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING, INC. NOW KNOWN AS KINDRED HEALTHCARE OPERATING, LLC.

Country Villa Service Corp.

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA SPECIALITY CARE, I

FOUNTAIN VALLEY REGIONAL HOSPITAL AND

Christopher Salem

SOUTH COAST GLOBAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC

Country Villa Plaza

Tami Milller

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF BRUCE VAIL RORTY

Defendant Attorneys

Schmid & Voiles

La Follette, Johnson, De Haas, Fesler & Ames

Other Attorneys

LA FOLLETTE, JOHNSON, DE HAAS, FESLER

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY TRAN, HA T.; TRAN, HAI N.; TRAN, HOI N.; TRAN, KHANH N.; TRAN, LOAN T.; TRAN, LUOT T.; TRAN, MICHAEL N. ON 06/07/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY TRAN, HA T.; TRAN, HAI N.; TRAN, HOI N.; TRAN, KHANH N.; TRAN, LOAN T.; TRAN, LUOT T.; TRAN, MICHAEL N. ON 06/07/2019

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/01/2019 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/01/2019 09:00:00 AM.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY TRAN, LUOT T. ON 03/01/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY TRAN, LUOT T. ON 03/01/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY TRAN, LUOT T. ON 03/01/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY TRAN, LUOT T. ON 03/01/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12508435 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12332154.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12508435 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12332154.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES (DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL) FILED BY SALEM, CHRISTOPHER; SALEM, D.O. INC. ON 02/13/2019

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES (DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL) FILED BY SALEM, CHRISTOPHER; SALEM, D.O. INC. ON 02/13/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SALEM, CHRISTOPHER; SALEM, D.O. INC. ON 02/13/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SALEM, CHRISTOPHER; SALEM, D.O. INC. ON 02/13/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12507547 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12331266.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12507547 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12331266.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY DAVID N. PHAM, M.D., INC. ON 02/14/2019

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY DAVID N. PHAM, M.D., INC. ON 02/14/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DAVID N. PHAM, M.D., INC. ON 02/14/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY DAVID N. PHAM, M.D., INC. ON 02/14/2019

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (CMC) FILED BY TRAN, LUOT T. ON 01/09/2019

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE (CMC) FILED BY TRAN, LUOT T. ON 01/09/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12484266 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12307965.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12484266 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12307965.

STIPULATION - OTHER (TO STRIKE CLAIM FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES) FILED BY SALEM, D.O. INC.; SALEM, CHRISTOPHER ON 01/07/2019

STIPULATION - OTHER (TO STRIKE CLAIM FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES) FILED BY SALEM, D.O. INC.; SALEM, CHRISTOPHER ON 01/07/2019

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY SALEM, D.O. INC.; SALEM, CHRISTOPHER ON 01/07/2019

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY SALEM, D.O. INC.; SALEM, CHRISTOPHER ON 01/07/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12483548 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12307247.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12483548 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12307247.

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DAVID N. PHAM, M.D., INC. ON 01/07/2019

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DAVID N. PHAM, M.D., INC. ON 01/07/2019

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 12/21/2018 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 12/21/2018 09:00:00 AM.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TRAN, LUOT T. ON 12/17/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TRAN, LUOT T. ON 12/17/2018

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY TRAN, HA T.; TRAN, HAI N.; TRAN, HOI N.; TRAN, KHANH N.; TRAN, LOAN T.; TRAN, LUOT T.; TRAN, MICHAEL N. ON 06/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1631596 RECEIVED ON 06/07/2019 01:57:21 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/01/2019 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • THE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 12/06/2019 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT C19.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • THE JURY TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 01/24/2020 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C19.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/06/2019 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C19 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 01/24/2020 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C19 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY TRAN, LUOT T. ON 03/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY TRAN, LUOT T. ON 03/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3764953 RECEIVED ON 03/01/2019 07:45:26 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TRAN, LUOT T. ON 12/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TRAN, LUOT T. ON 12/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4913822 RECEIVED ON 12/04/2018 11:17:50 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/21/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C19 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCHWARM, WALTER ON 08/20/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY W-W-ONETOUCHINC FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12405131 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12228861.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TRAN, LUOT T.; TRAN, HA T.; TRAN, HAI N.; TRAN, KHANH N.; TRAN, LOAN T.; TRAN, HOI N.; TRAN, MICHAEL N. ON 08/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TRAN, LUOT T.; TRAN, HA T.; TRAN, HAI N.; TRAN, KHANH N.; TRAN, LOAN T.; TRAN, HOI N.; TRAN, MICHAEL N. ON 08/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY TRAN, LUOT T.; TRAN, HA T.; TRAN, HAI N.; TRAN, KHANH N.; TRAN, LOAN T.; TRAN, HOI N.; TRAN, MICHAEL N. ON 08/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4878489 RECEIVED ON 08/20/2018 04:05:28 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COUNTRY VILLA SERVICE CORP. is a litigant

Latest cases where Fountain Valley Regional Hospital and Medical Center is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALFIORNIA SPECIALTY CARE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Coastal Communities Hospital is a litigant