This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/05/2018 at 18:53:39 (UTC).

LUNA FINANCIAL LLC VS. MAYELI SEGURA

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 LUNA FINANCIAL LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MAYELI SEGURA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LUNA FINANCIAL LLC

Defendant

MAYELI SEGURA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2017
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT DISMISSAL- LACK OF PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 12/13/2017 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT DISMISSAL- LACK OF PROSECUTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • COURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY LUNA FINANCIAL LLC ON 10/20/2017; Filing Party: LUNA FINANCIAL LLC ON 10/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LUNA FINANCIAL FOR 06 - SMALL CLAIMS GREATER THAN 12 WITHIN PREVIOUS 12 MONTHS IN THE AMOUNT OF 100.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234447 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12058126.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 12/13/2017 AT 08:30:00 AM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY LUNA FINANCIAL LLC ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: LUNA FINANCIAL LLC ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.