This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/05/2018 at 18:47:19 (UTC).

LUNA FINANCIAL LLC VS. IVAN GARCIA

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 LUNA FINANCIAL LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against IVAN GARCIA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LUNA FINANCIAL LLC

Defendant

IVAN GARCIA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2018
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LUNA FINANCIAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12287944 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12111707.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • WRIT ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (SMALL CLAIMS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY LUNA FINANCIAL LLC ON 12/11/2017; Filing Party: LUNA FINANCIAL LLC ON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 12/11/2017 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY LUNA FINANCIAL LLC ON 10/23/2017; Filing Party: LUNA FINANCIAL LLC ON 10/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LUNA FINANCIAL FOR 06 - SMALL CLAIMS GREATER THAN 12 WITHIN PREVIOUS 12 MONTHS IN THE AMOUNT OF 100.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234686 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12058365.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 12/11/2017 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C04 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY LUNA FINANCIAL LLC ON 10/10/2017; Filing Party: LUNA FINANCIAL LLC ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.