This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 07/13/2021 at 13:20:16 (UTC).

LUIS LICEA VS. TOO FACED COSMETICS LLC

Case Summary

On 03/22/2019 LUIS LICEA filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against TOO FACED COSMETICS LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Luis Licea

Defendants

Too Faced Cosmetics LLC

Too Faced Cosmetics, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Pacific Trial Attorneys

Defendant Attorney

Jeffer Mangels Butler & Mitchell LLP

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY LICEA, LUIS ON 12/20/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY LICEA, LUIS ON 12/20/2019

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/21/2019 02:12:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/21/2019 02:12:00 PM.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY LICEA, LUIS ON 11/19/2019

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY LICEA, LUIS ON 11/19/2019

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 08/06/2019 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 08/06/2019 09:00:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12594540 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12418599.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12594540 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12418599.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY LICEA, LUIS ON 07/22/2019

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY LICEA, LUIS ON 07/22/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY LICEA, LUIS ON 07/22/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY LICEA, LUIS ON 07/22/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY LICEA, LUIS; TOO FACED COSMETICS LLC ON 07/25/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY LICEA, LUIS; TOO FACED COSMETICS LLC ON 07/25/2019

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4988361 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4988361 REJECTED.

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/09/2019

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/09/2019

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1642031 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1642031 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2813555 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2813555 REJECTED.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12583410 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12407469.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12583410 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12407469.

STIPULATION AND ORDER (PROTECTIVE ORDER) FILED BY TOO FACED COSMETICS, INC. ON 07/09/2019

STIPULATION AND ORDER (PROTECTIVE ORDER) FILED BY TOO FACED COSMETICS, INC. ON 07/09/2019

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/09/2019

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/09/2019

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/09/2019

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/09/2019

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/09/2019

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/09/2019

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY LICEA, LUIS ON 12/20/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2872724 RECEIVED ON 12/20/2019 10:19:53 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 11/21/2019 02:12:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketTHE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE IS SCHEDULED FOR 01/08/2020 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C-42.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 01/08/2020 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2861450 RECEIVED ON 11/19/2019 11:22:34 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY LICEA, LUIS ON 11/19/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY TOO FACED COSMETICS, INC. ON 05/02/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/06/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY LICEA, LUIS ON 04/08/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2781483 RECEIVED ON 04/08/2019 08:41:33 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12522472 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12346231.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4950859 RECEIVED ON 03/22/2019 12:18:55 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOFFER, DAVID ON 03/22/2019.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LICEA, LUIS ON 03/22/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LICEA, LUIS ON 03/22/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY LICEA, LUIS ON 03/22/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Too Faced Cosmetics, LLC is a litigant