This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/10/2023 at 22:07:08 (UTC).

LUIS JALIL VS. GM MEDICAL TRANSPORTATION

Case Summary

On 02/16/2022 LUIS JALIL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GM MEDICAL TRANSPORTATION. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Luis Jalil

Defendants

American Logistics LLC

GM Medical Transportation

Gabriel Martinez Alfonso

Inland Empire Health Plan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Accident Fighters, APC

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY JALIL, LUIS ON 02/16/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY JALIL, LUIS ON 02/16/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY JALIL, LUIS ON 02/16/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY JALIL, LUIS ON 02/16/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13009453 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12837421.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13009453 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12837421.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/09/2023 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/09/2023 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY JALIL, LUIS ON 04/22/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY JALIL, LUIS ON 04/22/2022

CASE REASSIGNED TO DAVID HESSELTINE EFFECTIVE 01/09/2023.

CASE REASSIGNED TO DAVID HESSELTINE EFFECTIVE 01/09/2023.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JALIL, LUIS ON 12/21/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JALIL, LUIS ON 12/21/2022

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY JALIL, LUIS ON 12/23/2022

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY JALIL, LUIS ON 12/23/2022

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OC GENERATED

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OC GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

01/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2023
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OC GENERATED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2023

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/13/2023 AT 09:30:00 AM IN AT .

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2023

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE REASSIGNED TO AT ON 01/13/2023 AT 09:30:00 AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketPROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY JALIL, LUIS ON 12/23/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/23/2022

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11080808 RECEIVED ON 12/23/2022 10:10:42 AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY JALIL, LUIS ON 12/21/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/21/2022

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31247491 RECEIVED ON 12/21/2022 11:46:59 AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCASE REASSIGNED TO DAVID HESSELTINE EFFECTIVE 01/09/2023.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/27/2022

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1979522 RECEIVED ON 04/22/2022 10:46:47 AM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY JALIL, LUIS ON 04/22/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/09/2023 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2022
View Court Documents

DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13009453 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12837421.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/17/2022

DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1952896 RECEIVED ON 02/16/2022 03:51:00 PM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2022

DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GASTELUM, JOHN ON 02/16/2022.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY JALIL, LUIS ON 02/16/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY JALIL, LUIS ON 02/16/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less