This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/05/2021 at 09:12:37 (UTC).

LUIS ESCALERA ESPINOSA VS. BILLION AUTO GROUP

Case Summary

On 07/07/2020 LUIS ESCALERA ESPINOSA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against BILLION AUTO GROUP. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Luis Escalera Espinosa

Defendants

Billion Auto Group

5 Star Auto Group

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gould & Associates

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY ESPINOSA, LUIS ESCALERA ON 07/07/2020

COMPLAINT FILED BY ESPINOSA, LUIS ESCALERA ON 07/07/2020

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ESPINOSA, LUIS ESCALERA ON 07/07/2020

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ESPINOSA, LUIS ESCALERA ON 07/07/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ESPINOSA, LUIS ESCALERA ON 07/07/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ESPINOSA, LUIS ESCALERA ON 07/07/2020

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12757198 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12583561.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12757198 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12583561.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER DELANEY, THOMAS ON 07/07/2020.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER DELANEY, THOMAS ON 07/07/2020.

PAYMENT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12757198 IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00 VOIDED DUE TO OTHER. EF#3918118 VENDOR DID NOT PAY. VOID AND NFD

PAYMENT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12757198 IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00 VOIDED DUE TO OTHER. EF#3918118 VENDOR DID NOT PAY. VOID AND NFD

NOTICE OF FEES DUE ELECTRONIC FILING

NOTICE OF FEES DUE ELECTRONIC FILING

JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/04/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/04/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 1) FILED BY ESPINOSA, LUIS ESCALERA ON 10/22/2020

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 1) FILED BY ESPINOSA, LUIS ESCALERA ON 10/22/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ESPINOSA, LUIS ESCALERA ON 11/03/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ESPINOSA, LUIS ESCALERA ON 11/03/2020

CASE REASSIGNED TO STEPHANIE GEORGE EFFECTIVE 01/01/2021.

CASE REASSIGNED TO STEPHANIE GEORGE EFFECTIVE 01/01/2021.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ESPINOSA, LUIS ESCALERA ON 04/14/2021

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ESPINOSA, LUIS ESCALERA ON 04/14/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41181765 RECEIVED ON 04/14/2021 04:04:45 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ESPINOSA, LUIS ESCALERA ON 04/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/01/2021
  • DocketJURY TRIAL REASSIGNED TO C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER ON 04/04/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE REASSIGNED TO STEPHANIE GEORGE EFFECTIVE 01/01/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY ESPINOSA, LUIS ESCALERA ON 11/03/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41129508 RECEIVED ON 11/03/2020 01:39:45 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 1) FILED BY ESPINOSA, LUIS ESCALERA ON 10/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3948147 RECEIVED ON 10/22/2020 10:56:52 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/04/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FEES DUE ELECTRONIC FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12757198 IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00 VOIDED DUE TO OTHER. EF#3918118 VENDOR DID NOT PAY. VOID AND NFD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12757198 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12583561.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3918118 RECEIVED ON 07/07/2020 11:29:02 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER DELANEY, THOMAS ON 07/07/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ESPINOSA, LUIS ESCALERA ON 07/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ESPINOSA, LUIS ESCALERA ON 07/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY ESPINOSA, LUIS ESCALERA ON 07/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 5 STAR AUTO GROUP DBA BILLION AUTO GROUP is a litigant