This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/11/2019 at 03:39:19 (UTC).

LUIS BARCENAS VS. HB PARKCO CONSTRUCTION, INC.

Case Summary

On 02/28/2018 LUIS BARCENAS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against HB PARKCO CONSTRUCTION, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LUIS BARCENAS

Defendant

HB PARKCO CONSTRUCTION, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMAILI & ASSOCIATES, PC

Defendant Attorney

Emilio Law Group, APC

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12406437 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12230167.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12406437 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12230167.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY BARCENAS, LUIS ON 08/23/2018

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY BARCENAS, LUIS ON 08/23/2018

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR NUNC PRO TUNC MINUTES 06/26/2018 02:16:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR NUNC PRO TUNC MINUTES 06/26/2018 02:16:00 PM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/26/2018 02:01:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/26/2018 02:01:00 PM.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY BARCENAS, LUIS ON 06/25/2018

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY BARCENAS, LUIS ON 06/25/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12354931 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12178678.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12354931 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12178678.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY HB PARKCO CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 05/22/2018

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY HB PARKCO CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 05/22/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BARCENAS, LUIS ON 04/03/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BARCENAS, LUIS ON 04/03/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BARCENAS, LUIS ON 03/26/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY BARCENAS, LUIS ON 03/26/2018

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/01/2018

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/01/2018

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER DELANEY, THOMAS ON 02/28/2018.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER DELANEY, THOMAS ON 02/28/2018.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BARCENAS, LUIS ON 02/28/2018

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BARCENAS, LUIS ON 02/28/2018

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY BARCENAS, LUIS ON 02/28/2018

STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY BARCENAS, LUIS ON 02/28/2018

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 02/28/2018.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 02/28/2018.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BARCENAS, LUIS ON 02/28/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BARCENAS, LUIS ON 02/28/2018

COMPLAINT FILED BY BARCENAS, LUIS ON 02/28/2018

COMPLAINT FILED BY BARCENAS, LUIS ON 02/28/2018

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2018
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12406437 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12230167.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER (OF PAYING FILING FEES) FILED BY BARCENAS, LUIS ON 08/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY BARCENAS, LUIS ON 08/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3701960 RECEIVED ON 08/23/2018 03:35:01 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR NUNC PRO TUNC MINUTES 06/26/2018 02:16:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • MINUTE ORDER DATED 06/26/2018 CORRECTED NUNC PRO TUNC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2018
  • BARCENAS, LUIS REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 03/01/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 03/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER DELANEY, THOMAS ON 02/28/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BARCENAS, LUIS ON 02/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF DAMAGES FILED BY BARCENAS, LUIS ON 02/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY BARCENAS, LUIS ON 02/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 02/28/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BARCENAS, LUIS ON 02/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY BARCENAS, LUIS ON 02/28/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3641121 RECEIVED ON 02/28/2018 11:12:41 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HB PARKCO CONSTRUCTION, INC is a litigant