This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 03:27:56 (UTC).

LOY MCKENRICK VS. CLIFF DUCHI

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 LOY MCKENRICK filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CLIFF DUCHI. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOY MCKENRICK

Defendants

SANDRA DUCHI

CLIFF DUCHI

KELLY DUCHI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE DURINGER LAW GROUP PLC.

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MCKENRICK, LOY ON 10/10/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MCKENRICK, LOY ON 10/10/2017

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY MCKENRICK, LOY ON 10/27/2017

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY MCKENRICK, LOY ON 10/27/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MCKENRICK, LOY ON 10/27/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MCKENRICK, LOY ON 10/27/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MCKENRICK, LOY ON 10/27/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MCKENRICK, LOY ON 10/27/2017

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 10/30/17) RECEIVED ON 10/27/2017.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 10/30/17) RECEIVED ON 10/27/2017.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 10/30/17) RECEIVED ON 10/27/2017.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 10/30/17) RECEIVED ON 10/27/2017.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12244866 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12068607.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12244866 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12068607.

COMPLAINT FILED BY MCKENRICK, LOY ON 10/10/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY MCKENRICK, LOY ON 10/10/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MCKENRICK, LOY ON 10/27/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MCKENRICK, LOY ON 10/27/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12233318 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12056998.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12233318 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12056998.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY MCKENRICK, LOY ON 10/27/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY MCKENRICK, LOY ON 10/27/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MCKENRICK, LOY ON 10/10/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MCKENRICK, LOY ON 10/10/2017

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 10/30/17) RECEIVED ON 10/27/2017.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 10/30/17) RECEIVED ON 10/27/2017.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12244866 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12068607.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED ON 10/30/17) RECEIVED ON 10/27/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 10/30/17) RECEIVED ON 10/27/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 10/30/17) RECEIVED ON 10/27/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY MCKENRICK, LOY ON 10/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MCKENRICK, LOY ON 10/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MCKENRICK, LOY ON 10/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY MCKENRICK, LOY ON 10/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY MCKENRICK, LOY ON 10/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2606814 RECEIVED ON 10/27/2017 08:51:37 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12233318 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12056998.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY MCKENRICK, LOY ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY MCKENRICK, LOY ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY MCKENRICK, LOY ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2600650 RECEIVED ON 10/09/2017 03:00:52 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.