This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:50:52 (UTC).

LORENZO COMELLA VS. LAURA ELAINE AKBAR

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 LORENZO COMELLA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LAURA ELAINE AKBAR. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LORENZO COMELLA

Defendants

LAURA ELAINE AKBAR

ALI MOHAMAD AKBAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF CLAY R. SIDES

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/13/2016 AT 02:00:00 PM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/13/2016 AT 02:00:00 PM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY COMELLA, LORENZO ON 05/19/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY COMELLA, LORENZO ON 05/19/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/26/2016 02:00:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/26/2016 02:00:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 07/25/2016 02:00:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 07/25/2016 02:00:00 PM.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO COMPLY RE:CRC 3.110B SCHEDULED FOR 05/17/2016 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO COMPLY RE:CRC 3.110B SCHEDULED FOR 05/17/2016 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MARKS, LINDA ON 02/26/2016.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MARKS, LINDA ON 02/26/2016.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY COMELLA, LORENZO ON 07/22/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY COMELLA, LORENZO ON 07/22/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927728 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751953.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927728 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751953.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY COMELLA, LORENZO ON 01/25/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY COMELLA, LORENZO ON 01/25/2017

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO COMPLY RE:CRC 3.110B 05/17/2016 08:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO COMPLY RE:CRC 3.110B 05/17/2016 08:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 06/13/2016 02:00:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 06/13/2016 02:00:00 PM.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY COMELLA, LORENZO ON 07/22/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY COMELLA, LORENZO ON 07/22/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY COMELLA, LORENZO ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY COMELLA, LORENZO ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY COMELLA, LORENZO ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY COMELLA, LORENZO ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY COMELLA, LORENZO ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY COMELLA, LORENZO ON 02/26/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY COMELLA, LORENZO ON 09/26/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY COMELLA, LORENZO ON 09/26/2016

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2017
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY COMELLA, LORENZO ON 01/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2525958 RECEIVED ON 01/25/2017 05:48:08 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 09/26/2016 02:00:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • THE DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING IS SCHEDULED FOR 02/06/2017 AT 02:00 PM IN DEPARTMENT C10.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • DEFAULT PROVE-UP HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 02/06/2017 AT 02:00:00 PM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY COMELLA, LORENZO ON 09/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2496571 RECEIVED ON 09/26/2016 05:30:04 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 07/25/2016 02:00:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO APPEAR SCHEDULED FOR 06/13/2016 AT 02:00:00 PM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO COMPLY RE:CRC 3.110B SCHEDULED FOR 06/13/2016 AT 02:00:00 PM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO COMPLY RE:CRC 3.110B SCHEDULED FOR 05/17/2016 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/13/2016 AT 02:00:00 PM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MARKS, LINDA ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927728 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751953.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY COMELLA, LORENZO ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY COMELLA, LORENZO ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY COMELLA, LORENZO ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2446694 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 12:55:55 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.