This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/27/2022 at 04:37:19 (UTC).

LORENZO BARRERA GUZMAN VS. EAN HOLDINGS, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/03/2022 LORENZO BARRERA GUZMAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against EAN HOLDINGS, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, West Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-WJC

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lorenzo Barrera Guzman

Defendants

Ean Holdings, LLC

Hernandez Installation Services, Inc.

Marco Duarte

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Offices of John C. Ye, APLC

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/07/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN W08 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/07/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN W08 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13043868 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12871884.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13043868 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12871884.

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY GUZMAN, LORENZO BARRERA ON 05/03/2022

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY GUZMAN, LORENZO BARRERA ON 05/03/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY GUZMAN, LORENZO BARRERA ON 05/03/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY GUZMAN, LORENZO BARRERA ON 05/03/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GUZMAN, LORENZO BARRERA ON 05/09/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GUZMAN, LORENZO BARRERA ON 05/09/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GUZMAN, LORENZO BARRERA ON 05/09/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GUZMAN, LORENZO BARRERA ON 05/09/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: SCHWARM; Department: W08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21157044 RECEIVED ON 05/09/2022 04:12:31 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GUZMAN, LORENZO BARRERA ON 05/09/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GUZMAN, LORENZO BARRERA ON 05/09/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21154798 RECEIVED ON 05/03/2022 04:21:21 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13043868 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12871884.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/07/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN W08 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY GUZMAN, LORENZO BARRERA ON 05/03/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY GUZMAN, LORENZO BARRERA ON 05/03/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCHWARM, WALTER ON 05/03/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EAN Holdings, LLC is a litigant