This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 03:28:38 (UTC).

LOIS ABRAMS VS. THE RITZ - CARLTON HOTEL COMPANY, L.L.C.

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 LOIS ABRAMS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against THE RITZ - CARLTON HOTEL COMPANY, L L C. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOIS ABRAMS

Defendants

THE RITZ - CARLTON HOTEL COMPANY, L.L.C.

THE RITZ - CARLTON HOTEL COMPANY, L.L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF MEYERS & BURNETT

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234238 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057917.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234238 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057917.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ABRAMS, LOIS ON 01/02/2018

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ABRAMS, LOIS ON 01/02/2018

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER FELL, SHEILA ON 10/10/2017.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER FELL, SHEILA ON 10/10/2017.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/08/2018 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/08/2018 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ABRAMS, LOIS ON 10/10/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ABRAMS, LOIS ON 10/10/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY ABRAMS, LOIS ON 10/10/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY ABRAMS, LOIS ON 10/10/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ABRAMS, LOIS ON 10/10/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ABRAMS, LOIS ON 10/10/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2018
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ABRAMS, LOIS ON 01/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3621825 RECEIVED ON 01/02/2018 03:35:54 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/08/2018 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER FELL, SHEILA ON 10/10/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234238 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057917.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ABRAMS, LOIS ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ABRAMS, LOIS ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY ABRAMS, LOIS ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2601186 RECEIVED ON 10/10/2017 04:50:07 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.