This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/11/2019 06:18:06

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 a Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce case was filed by LOGAN ZAPPAS against NICHOLAS ZAPPAS in the jurisdiction of Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California.

Case Details

  • Case Number XXXXX2490
  • Filing Date 10/10/2017
  • Case Status Undetermined
  • Case Type Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce
  • Jurisdiction Orange County Superior Courts
  • Judge LARSH, ERICK L.
  • Courthouse Lamoreaux Justice Center
  • County Orange
  • State California

Party Details

  • Undetermined EARLEY, WENDY
  • Represented By
    • Self Represented
  • Other ZAPPAS, LOGAN EARLEY
  • Represented By
    • Self Represented
  • Other ZAPPAS, NICHOLAS BENTON
  • Represented By
    • MINYARD MORRIS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2017
  • STIPULATION & ORDER 10/18/2017; Filing Party: EARLEY, WENDY
  • 10/18/2017
  • MINUTE ORDER 10/18/2017
  • 10/18/2017
  • CONSOLIDATED CASE 10/18/2017 Judge:LARSH, ERICK L.
  • 10/18/2017
  • HEARING - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE
  • 10/18/2017
  • APPOINTMENT - INVESTIGATOR TESTIMONY - EMERGENCY EV
  • 10/16/2017
  • NOTICE - LIMITED SCOPE REPRESENTATION 10/16/2017; Filing Party: ZAPPAS, NICHOLAS BENTON
  • 10/16/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - ELECTRONIC 10/16/2017; Filing Party: ZAPPAS, NICHOLAS BENTON
  • 10/16/2017
  • APPOINTMENT - EMERGENCY INVESTIGATION EV
  • 10/13/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - PERSONAL 10/13/2017; Filing Party: EARLEY, WENDY
  • 10/13/2017
  • DV PROOF - FIREARMS TURNED IN OR SOLD 10/13/2017; Filing Party: ZAPPAS, NICHOLAS BENTON
  • 10/10/2017
  • DV REQUEST - RESTRAINING ORDER 10/10/2017; Filing Party: ZAPPAS, LOGAN EARLEY
  • 10/10/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 10/10/2017; Filing Party: ZAPPAS, LOGAN EARLEY
  • 10/10/2017
  • DV TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER 10/10/2017; Filing Party: ZAPPAS, LOGAN EARLEY
  • 10/10/2017
  • DV NOTICE - COURT HEARING DOMESTIC VIOLENCE 10/10/2017; Filing Party: ZAPPAS, LOGAN EARLEY
  • 10/10/2017
  • APPLICATION & ORDER - APPOINT - GUARDIAN AD LITEM - MINOR 10/10/2017; Filing Party: ZAPPAS, LOGAN EARLEY
  • 10/10/2017
  • HEARING - EX PARTE - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE
  • 10/10/2017
  • EX PARTE REQUEST - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE 10/10/2017; Filing Party: ZAPPAS, LOGAN EARLEY

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.