This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:52:35 (UTC).

LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP. VS. AMERICAN SAFETY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AMERICAN SAFETY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP.

Defendants

AMERICAN SAFETY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

JEFF ERCOLINI AND KELLY ERCOLINI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GARY DEAN LOBEL

RONALD J. GREEN

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927290 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751515.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927290 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751515.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP. ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP. ON 02/26/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/08/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/08/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3429346 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3429346 REJECTED.

COMPLAINT FILED BY LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP. ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP. ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP. ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP. ON 02/26/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP. ON 06/23/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP. ON 06/23/2016

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER AGUIRRE, FREDERICK ON 02/26/2016.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER AGUIRRE, FREDERICK ON 02/26/2016.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP. ON 03/22/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP. ON 03/22/2016

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3429346 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP. ON 06/23/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4565985 RECEIVED ON 06/23/2016 09:36:40 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/08/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP. ON 03/22/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4521050 RECEIVED ON 03/22/2016 01:36:40 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER AGUIRRE, FREDERICK ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927290 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751515.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY LOBEL FINANCIAL CORP. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2446631 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 11:25:33 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.