This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/20/2018 at 19:28:02 (UTC).

LOANME INC. VS. EAZEL ESPLANA

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 LOANME INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against EAZEL ESPLANA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LOANME INC.

Defendant

EAZEL ESPLANA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2017
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LOANME FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12255999 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12079731.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • WRIT ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY LOANME INC. ON 11/06/2017; Filing Party: LOANME INC. ON 11/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LOANME FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12040216 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11864190.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2016
  • WRIT ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST FILED BY LOANME INC. ON 10/03/2016; Filing Party: LOANME INC. ON 10/03/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (SMALL CLAIMS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY (SMALL CLAIMS) FILED BY LOANME INC. ON 06/06/2016; Filing Party: LOANME INC. ON 06/06/

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 06/06/2016 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1309946 RECEIVED ON 03/15/2016 11:06:41 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY LOANME INC. ON 03/15/2016; Filing Party: LOANME INC. ON 03/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY KNOX ATTORNEY SERVICES, LLC FOR 06 - SMALL CLAIMS GREATER THAN 12 WITHIN PREVIOUS 12 MONTHS IN THE AMOUNT OF 100.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927027 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751252.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/06/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY LOANME INC. ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: LOANME INC. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.