This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/21/2022 at 00:02:53 (UTC).

LLOYD COPENBARGER, AS TRUSTEE OF THE HAZEL I. MAAG TRUST VS. WEST COAST HIGHWAY, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/13/2016 LLOYD COPENBARGER, AS TRUSTEE OF THE HAZEL I MAAG TRUST filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against WEST COAST HIGHWAY, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Defendants and Plaintiffs

LOBEL WEILAND GOLDEN FREIDMAN LLP

LLOYD COPENBARGER, AS TRUSTEE OF THE HAZEL I. MAAG TRUST

LLOYD COPENBARGER

LOBEL WEILAND GOLDEN FRIEDMAN LLP

Others and Defendants

KENT A. MCNAUGHTON

THEODORA ORINGHER PC

WEST COAST HIGHWAY, LLC

KENT A. MCNAUGHTON, AS TRUSTEE OF THE KENT MCNAUGHTON LIVING TRUST DATED JULY 1, 2003

LOBEL WEILAND GOLDEN FREIDMAN LLP

MCNAUGHTON GRAT I

MCNAUGHTON GRAT II

LOBEL WEILAND GOLDEN FRIEDMAN LLP

KENT A. MCNAUGHTON, AS TRUSTEE OF THE

Cross Defendants and Plaintiffs

LLOYD COPENBARGER, AS TRUSTEE OF THE HAZEL I. MAAG TRUST

HAMPTONHOLLEY LLP

COLIN C. HOLLEY

GEORGE L. HAMPTON IV

LLOYD COPENBARGER

GEORGE L. HAMPTON

Interested Parties

NEWPORT HARBOR OFFICES & MARINA, LLC

THE MCNAUGHTON COMPANY

Leslie Bower as trustee for the McNaughton Grantor Retained Annuity Trust I

Leslie Bower as trustee for the McNaughton Grantor Retained Annuity Trust II

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

HAMPTONHOLLEY LLP

Hall Griffin LLP

Other and Defendant Attorneys

LOBEL WEILAND GOLDEN FRIEDMAN LLP

Weiland Golden Goodrich LLP

THEODORA ORINGHER PC

SHULMAN HODGES & BASTIAN LLP

IRELL & MANELLA LLP

 

Court Documents

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/01/2018

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/01/2018

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY LLOYD COPENBARGER, AS TRUSTEE OF THE HAZEL I. MAAG TRUST ON 05/01/2018

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY LLOYD COPENBARGER, AS TRUSTEE OF THE HAZEL I. MAAG TRUST ON 05/01/2018

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY LLOYD COPENBARGER, AS TRUSTEE OF THE HAZEL I. MAAG TRUST ON 05/01/2018

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY LLOYD COPENBARGER, AS TRUSTEE OF THE HAZEL I. MAAG TRUST ON 05/01/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12341264 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12164993.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12341264 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12164993.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 05/02/2018 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 05/02/2018 01:30:00 PM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY LLOYD COPENBARGER, AS TRUSTEE OF THE HAZEL I. MAAG TRUST ON 05/02/2018

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY LLOYD COPENBARGER, AS TRUSTEE OF THE HAZEL I. MAAG TRUST ON 05/02/2018

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY MCNAUGHTON, KENT A.; KENT A. MCNAUGHTON, AS TRUSTEE OF THE KENT MCNAUGHTON LIVING TRUST DATED JULY 1, 2003; LOBEL WEILAND GOLDEN FRIEDMAN LLP ON 06/13/2018

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME FILED BY MCNAUGHTON, KENT A.; KENT A. MCNAUGHTON, AS TRUSTEE OF THE KENT MCNAUGHTON LIVING TRUST DATED JULY 1, 2003; LOBEL WEILAND GOLDEN FRIEDMAN LLP ON 06/13/2018

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY LLOYD COPENBARGER, AS TRUSTEE OF THE HAZEL I. MAAG TRUST ON 07/11/2018

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY LLOYD COPENBARGER, AS TRUSTEE OF THE HAZEL I. MAAG TRUST ON 07/11/2018

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY LLOYD COPENBARGER, AS TRUSTEE OF THE HAZEL I. MAAG TRUST ON 07/11/2018

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY LLOYD COPENBARGER, AS TRUSTEE OF THE HAZEL I. MAAG TRUST ON 07/11/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12381846 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12205576.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12381846 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12205576.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/11/2018

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 07/11/2018

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 07/12/2018 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 07/12/2018 01:30:00 PM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY LLOYD COPENBARGER, AS TRUSTEE OF THE HAZEL I. MAAG TRUST ON 07/12/2018

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY LLOYD COPENBARGER, AS TRUSTEE OF THE HAZEL I. MAAG TRUST ON 07/12/2018

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/16/2018

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/16/2018

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY LLOYD COPENBARGER, AS TRUSTEE OF THE HAZEL I. MAAG TRUST ON 11/16/2018

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY LLOYD COPENBARGER, AS TRUSTEE OF THE HAZEL I. MAAG TRUST ON 11/16/2018

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY LLOYD COPENBARGER, AS TRUSTEE OF THE HAZEL I. MAAG TRUST ON 11/16/2018

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY LLOYD COPENBARGER, AS TRUSTEE OF THE HAZEL I. MAAG TRUST ON 11/16/2018

279 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketCOURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 11/18/2019 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3843329 RECEIVED ON 10/09/2019 08:33:15 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1670554 RECEIVED ON 09/26/2019 01:19:22 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY LLOYD COPENBARGER, AS TRUSTEE OF THE HAZEL I. MAAG TRUST ON 10/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SCHEDULED FOR 11/18/2019 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C66 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketTHE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 11/18/2019 AT 01:30 PM IN DEPARTMENT C66.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA 10/01/2019 10:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
504 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY LLOYD COPENBARGER, AS TRUSTEE OF THE HAZEL I. MAAG TRUST ON 06/30/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY LLOYD COPENBARGER, AS TRUSTEE OF THE HAZEL I. MAAG TRUST ON 06/30/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY LLOYD COPENBARGER, AS TRUSTEE OF THE HAZEL I. MAAG TRUST ON 06/30/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4563617 RECEIVED ON 06/17/2016 12:41:34 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LLOYD COPENBARGER, AS TRUSTEE OF THE HAZEL I. MAAG TRUST ON 06/17/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4561445 RECEIVED ON 06/13/2016 07:50:20 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11982945 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11807030.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY LLOYD COPENBARGER, AS TRUSTEE OF THE HAZEL I. MAAG TRUST ON 06/13/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LLOYD COPENBARGER, AS TRUSTEE OF THE HAZEL I. MAAG TRUST ON 06/13/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCOTT, NATHAN ON 06/13/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LLOYD COPENBARGER, AS TRUSTEE OF THE HAZEL I. MAAG TRUST is a litigant

Latest cases where Newport Harbor Offices & Marina, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where THEODORA ORINGHER PC is a litigant