This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 03:31:23 (UTC).

LISA L. TYSON VS. SELENE FINANCE

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 LISA L TYSON filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against SELENE FINANCE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LISA L. TYSON

Defendants

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY

CEST LA VEECK, INC.

BARRETT DAFFIN FRAPPIER TREDER & WEISS, LLP

SELENE FINANCE

SELENE FINANCE LP

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, AS TRUSTEE FOR BCAT 2015-14BTT

CEST LA VEECK INVESTMENT, INC.

WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB,

BARRETT DAFFIN FRAPPIER TREDER & WEISS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MAC LAW, PC

LAW OFFICES OF MARK S. MARTINEZ, APLC

Defendant Attorneys

BARRETT DAFFIN FRAPPIER TREDER & WEISS, LLP

WRIGHT, FINLAY & ZAK, LLP

ZIEVE BRODNAX & STEELE, LLP

H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES

Other Attorneys

BARRETT DAFFIN FRAPPIER TREDER & WEISS

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TYSON, LISA L. ON 10/24/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY TYSON, LISA L. ON 10/24/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12246441 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12070182.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12246441 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12070182.

OPPOSITION FILED BY CEST LA VEECK INVESTMENT, INC. ON 12/12/2017

OPPOSITION FILED BY CEST LA VEECK INVESTMENT, INC. ON 12/12/2017

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY TYSON, LISA L. ON 10/12/2017

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY TYSON, LISA L. ON 10/12/2017

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1429891 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1429891 REJECTED.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/09/2018 AT 09:30:00 AM IN C17 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/09/2018 AT 09:30:00 AM IN C17 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY CEST LA VEECK INVESTMENT, INC. ON 12/29/2017

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY CEST LA VEECK INVESTMENT, INC. ON 12/29/2017

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2607201 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2607201 REJECTED.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/26/2017

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 12/26/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY TYSON, LISA L. ON 04/04/2018

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY TYSON, LISA L. ON 04/04/2018

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/14/2017

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/14/2017

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY TYSON, LISA L. ON 01/10/2018

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY TYSON, LISA L. ON 01/10/2018

OPPOSITION FILED BY TYSON, LISA L. ON 10/12/2017

OPPOSITION FILED BY TYSON, LISA L. ON 10/12/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 120.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12245177 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12068917.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING, 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 120.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12245177 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12068917.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12249051 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12072773.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12249051 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12072773.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY SELENE FINANCE LP; WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, AS TRUSTEE FOR BCAT 2015-14BTT ON 11/15/2017

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY SELENE FINANCE LP; WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, AS TRUSTEE FOR BCAT 2015-14BTT ON 11/15/2017

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY SELENE FINANCE LP; WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, AS TRUSTEE FOR BCAT 2015-14BTT ON 11/15/2017

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY SELENE FINANCE LP; WILMINGTON SAVINGS FUND SOCIETY, FSB, AS TRUSTEE FOR BCAT 2015-14BTT ON 11/15/2017

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2018
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY TYSON, LISA L. ON 04/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1485339 RECEIVED ON 04/04/2018 09:54:17 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/09/2018 09:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 04/13/2018 AT 09:30 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO PARTY'S MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/13/2018 AT 09:30:00 AM IN C17 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY TYSON, LISA L. ON 02/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2638833 RECEIVED ON 02/08/2018 12:02:36 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY TYSON, LISA L. ON 01/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
70 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY TYSON, LISA L. ON 10/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2601784 RECEIVED ON 10/12/2017 10:19:25 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY TYSON, LISA L. ON 10/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GRIFFIN, CRAIG ON 10/10/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12234231 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057910.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY TYSON, LISA L. ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY TYSON, LISA L. ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1429256 RECEIVED ON 10/10/2017 04:52:37 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.