This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/11/2019 at 11:45:23 (UTC).

LISA HODGES VS MICHAEL HODGES

Case Summary

On 01/23/2018 LISA HODGES filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MICHAEL HODGES. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The Judge overseeing this case is COOPER, SCOTT B.. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0619

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

Judge

COOPER, SCOTT B.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Hodges, Lisa A.

Respondent

Hodges, Michael J.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

FEY, THERESE

THERESE M. FEY, APC

Respondent Attorney

FARZAD FAMILY LAW, APC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2018
  • WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY 12/17/2018 Hodges Not. of W'drawal; Filing Party: HODGES, LISA A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 12/17/2018 Hodges POS; Filing Party: HODGES, LISA A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • MINUTE ORDER 12/06/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • HEARING - RFO - CUSTODY / VISITATION / CHILD / SPOUS SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • CONFERENCE - MANDATORY SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DECLARATION - NON APPEARANCE - MEDIATION APPOINTMENT 11/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • APPOINTMENT - PARENT EDUCATION / MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 11/19/2018; Filing Party: HODGES, LISA A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 11/19/2018; Filing Party: HODGES, LISA A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • STIPULATION & WAIVERS (NO FEE) 11/19/2018; Filing Party: HODGES, LISA A.

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2018
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 04/12/2018 Hodges Decl. Re Service; Filing Party: HODGES, LISA A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 03/19/2018; Filing Party: HODGES, MICHAEL J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 03/19/2018; Filing Party: HODGES, MICHAEL J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 03/19/2018; Filing Party: HODGES, MICHAEL J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • NOTICE - OTHER 03/19/2018; Filing Party: HODGES, MICHAEL J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 02/27/2018 Hodges Proof of Service; Filing Party: HODGES, LISA A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 01/23/2018 Hodges Petition; Filing Party: HODGES, LISA A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 01/23/2018 Hodges UCCJEA; Filing Party: HODGES, LISA A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 01/23/2018 Hodges Fam. Law Not.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • SUMMONS 01/23/2018 Hodges Summons, Pet., etc; Filing Party: HODGES, LISA A.

    Read MoreRead Less