This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/24/2022 at 14:43:14 (UTC).

LINDSEY KATH VS ADAM KATH

Case Summary

On 10/29/2018 LINDSEY KATH filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ADAM KATH. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MINERICH, PAUL T.. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****9068

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

Judge

MINERICH, PAUL T.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Kath, Lindsey

Respondent

Kath, Adam

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

SHAFFER, PAMELA JOY

Respondent Attorney

PHILLIPS WHISNANT GAZIN GORCZYCA & CURTIN LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE - RELATED CASE - UPDATE PARTY 10/29/2018 Notice - Related Case

NOTICE - RELATED CASE - UPDATE PARTY 10/29/2018 Notice - Related Case

PETITION - DISSOLUTION 10/29/2018 Petition - Dissolution

PETITION - DISSOLUTION 10/29/2018 Petition - Dissolution

DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 10/29/2018 Declaration - Uniform Custody

DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 10/29/2018 Declaration - Uniform Custody

SUMMONS 10/29/2018 Summons

SUMMONS 10/29/2018 Summons

INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 11/02/2018 Income & Expense Declaration

INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 11/02/2018 Income & Expense Declaration

RFO - CUSTODY / VISITATION / CHILD SUPPORT / SPOUSAL SUPPORT 11/02/2018 Rfo - Custody / Visitation / Child Support / Spousal Support

RFO - CUSTODY / VISITATION / CHILD SUPPORT / SPOUSAL SUPPORT 11/02/2018 Rfo - Custody / Visitation / Child Support / Spousal Support

PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 11/14/2018 Proof Of Service - Summons

PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 11/14/2018 Proof Of Service - Summons

STATUS - MEDIATION 12/03/2018

STATUS - MEDIATION 12/03/2018

RESPONSIVE DECLARATION - REQUEST FOR ORDER 12/04/2018 Responsive Declaration - Request For Order

RESPONSIVE DECLARATION - REQUEST FOR ORDER 12/04/2018 Responsive Declaration - Request For Order

RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 12/10/2018 Response - Dissolution

RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 12/10/2018 Response - Dissolution

DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 12/10/2018 Declaration - Uniform Custody

DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 12/10/2018 Declaration - Uniform Custody

NOTICE - RELATED CASE - NO PARTY UPDATE 12/10/2018 Notice - Related Case

NOTICE - RELATED CASE - NO PARTY UPDATE 12/10/2018 Notice - Related Case

PROOF OF SERVICE - PERSONAL 12/10/2018 Proof Of Service - Personal

PROOF OF SERVICE - PERSONAL 12/10/2018 Proof Of Service - Personal

INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 12/12/2018 Income & Expense Declaration

INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 12/12/2018 Income & Expense Declaration

MINUTE ORDER 12/17/2018

MINUTE ORDER 12/17/2018

STIPULATION 01/15/2019

STIPULATION 01/15/2019

DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 06/20/2019 Declaration - Service Of Declaration Of Disclosure

DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 06/20/2019 Declaration - Service Of Declaration Of Disclosure

DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 08/22/2019 DEC RE DEC

DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 08/22/2019 DEC RE DEC

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATION 02/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER 02/04/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • HearingDescription: CONFERENCE - STATUS; Department: L71

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketCONFERENCE - STATUS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER 10/03/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketJUDGMENT - FAMILY CODE 2336 09/30/2019 Judge:MINERICH, PAUL T.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 09/30/2019; Filing Party: KATH, LINDSEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 09/30/2019; Filing Party: KATH, LINDSEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION & WAIVERS (NO FEE) 09/30/2019; Filing Party: KATH, LINDSEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 09/30/2019; Filing Party: KATH, LINDSEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2018
  • HearingDescription: APPOINTMENT - MEDIATION; Department: FAMILY COURT SERVICES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketAPPOINTMENT - MEDIATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATUS - MEDIATION 12/03/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 11/14/2018 Proof Of Service - Summons; Filing Party: KATH, LINDSEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketINCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 11/02/2018 Income & Expense Declaration; Filing Party: KATH, LINDSEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRFO - CUSTODY / VISITATION / CHILD SUPPORT / SPOUSAL SUPPORT 11/02/2018 Rfo - Custody / Visitation / Child Support / Spousal Support; Filing Party: KATH, LINDSEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - RELATED CASE - UPDATE PARTY 10/29/2018 Notice - Related Case; Filing Party: KATH, LINDSEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION - DISSOLUTION 10/29/2018 Petition - Dissolution; Filing Party: KATH, LINDSEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 10/29/2018 Declaration - Uniform Custody; Filing Party: KATH, LINDSEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS 10/29/2018 Summons; Filing Party: KATH, LINDSEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less