This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 08:48:37 (UTC).

LINDA QUACH VS. RICHARD OBRECHT

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 LINDA QUACH filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RICHARD OBRECHT. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KEN EAR

LINDA QUACH

Defendants

RON OBRECHT

OBRECHT'S SOLID SURFACE, INC.

RICHARD OBRECHT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOREY & UPTON, LLP

Defendant Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF JOHN A. HAUSER

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY QUACH, LINDA; EAR, KEN ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY QUACH, LINDA; EAR, KEN ON 02/26/2016

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY OBRECHT'S SOLID SURFACE, INC.; OBRECHT, RICHARD; OBRECHT, RON ON 03/22/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY OBRECHT'S SOLID SURFACE, INC.; OBRECHT, RICHARD; OBRECHT, RON ON 03/22/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY QUACH, LINDA; EAR, KEN ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY QUACH, LINDA; EAR, KEN ON 02/26/2016

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY QUACH, LINDA; EAR, KEN ON 07/06/2016

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY QUACH, LINDA; EAR, KEN ON 07/06/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/11/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C34 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/11/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C34 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4682305 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4682305 REJECTED.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,455.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12011677 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11835773.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,455.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12011677 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11835773.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/23/2017 02:02:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/23/2017 02:02:00 PM.

COMPLAINT FILED BY QUACH, LINDA; EAR, KEN ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY QUACH, LINDA; EAR, KEN ON 02/26/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY OBRECHT'S SOLID SURFACE, INC.; OBRECHT, RICHARD; OBRECHT, RON ON 08/08/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY OBRECHT'S SOLID SURFACE, INC.; OBRECHT, RICHARD; OBRECHT, RON ON 08/08/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY OBRECHT'S SOLID SURFACE, INC.; OBRECHT, RICHARD; OBRECHT, RON ON 09/14/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY OBRECHT'S SOLID SURFACE, INC.; OBRECHT, RICHARD; OBRECHT, RON ON 09/14/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY QUACH, LINDA; EAR, KEN ON 06/24/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY QUACH, LINDA; EAR, KEN ON 06/24/2016

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY QUACH, LINDA; EAR, KEN ON 02/23/2017

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY QUACH, LINDA; EAR, KEN ON 02/23/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927683 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751908.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927683 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751908.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GOODING, MARTHA ON 02/26/2016.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GOODING, MARTHA ON 02/26/2016.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 07/11/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 07/11/2016 09:00:00 AM.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY OBRECHT'S SOLID SURFACE, INC.; OBRECHT, RICHARD; OBRECHT, RON ON 08/08/2016

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY OBRECHT'S SOLID SURFACE, INC.; OBRECHT, RICHARD; OBRECHT, RON ON 08/08/2016

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2017
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY OBRECHT'S SOLID SURFACE, INC.; OBRECHT, RICHARD; OBRECHT, RON ON 03/22/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3524938 RECEIVED ON 03/22/2017 10:09:14 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 02/23/2017 02:02:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE IS SCHEDULED FOR 05/01/2017 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C34.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 05/01/2017 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C34 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY QUACH, LINDA; EAR, KEN ON 02/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2532983 RECEIVED ON 02/23/2017 10:07:39 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4572061 RECEIVED ON 07/06/2016 05:14:04 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY QUACH, LINDA; EAR, KEN ON 06/24/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3428419 RECEIVED ON 06/24/2016 12:12:12 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/11/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C34 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GOODING, MARTHA ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927683 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751908.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY QUACH, LINDA; EAR, KEN ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY QUACH, LINDA; EAR, KEN ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY QUACH, LINDA; EAR, KEN ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/29/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1307003 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 12:55:20 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.