This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 11/30/2021 at 06:41:41 (UTC).

LINDA PUCKETT VS. VICTORIA HEALTHCARE CENTER

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 LINDA PUCKETT filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against VICTORIA HEALTHCARE CENTER. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Diana Reynolds

Linda Puckett

Ron Sadon

Tracy McCourt

Respondents and Defendants

Costa Victoria Healthcare, LLC

Ensign Services, Inc.

The Ensign Group, Inc.

Victoria Healthcare Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Moran Law

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Clark Hill LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY PUCKETT, LINDA; SADON, RON; MCCOURT, TRACY; REYNOLDS, DIANA ON 09/17/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY PUCKETT, LINDA; SADON, RON; MCCOURT, TRACY; REYNOLDS, DIANA ON 09/17/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PUCKETT, LINDA; SADON, RON; MCCOURT, TRACY ON 09/17/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PUCKETT, LINDA; SADON, RON; MCCOURT, TRACY ON 09/17/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PUCKETT, LINDA; SADON, RON; MCCOURT, TRACY ON 09/17/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PUCKETT, LINDA; SADON, RON; MCCOURT, TRACY ON 09/17/2021

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY PUCKETT, LINDA; SADON, RON; MCCOURT, TRACY ON 09/17/2021

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY PUCKETT, LINDA; SADON, RON; MCCOURT, TRACY ON 09/17/2021

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY PUCKETT, LINDA; SADON, RON; MCCOURT, TRACY ON 09/17/2021

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY PUCKETT, LINDA; SADON, RON; MCCOURT, TRACY ON 09/17/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12945158 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12773057.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12945158 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12773057.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/18/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/18/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY THE ENSIGN GROUP, INC.; ENSIGN SERVICES, INC.; COSTA VICTORIA HEALTHCARE, LLC ON 10/28/2021

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY THE ENSIGN GROUP, INC.; ENSIGN SERVICES, INC.; COSTA VICTORIA HEALTHCARE, LLC ON 10/28/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,305.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12963540 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12791463.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,305.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12963540 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12791463.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PUCKETT, LINDA ON 10/28/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PUCKETT, LINDA ON 10/28/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PUCKETT, LINDA ON 10/28/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PUCKETT, LINDA ON 10/28/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PUCKETT, LINDA ON 10/28/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PUCKETT, LINDA ON 10/28/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PUCKETT, LINDA ON 10/28/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PUCKETT, LINDA ON 10/28/2021

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: SERVINO; Department: C21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PUCKETT, LINDA ON 10/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41257962 RECEIVED ON 10/28/2021 03:55:48 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PUCKETT, LINDA ON 10/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1911672 RECEIVED ON 10/28/2021 03:55:50 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PUCKETT, LINDA ON 10/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21082708 RECEIVED ON 10/28/2021 03:55:50 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PUCKETT, LINDA ON 10/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31079961 RECEIVED ON 10/28/2021 03:55:50 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,305.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12963540 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12791463.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41257719 RECEIVED ON 10/28/2021 11:12:42 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/18/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12945158 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12773057.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21066773 RECEIVED ON 09/17/2021 04:17:36 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SERVINO, DEBORAH ON 09/17/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY PUCKETT, LINDA; SADON, RON; MCCOURT, TRACY ON 09/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY PUCKETT, LINDA; SADON, RON; MCCOURT, TRACY ON 09/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PUCKETT, LINDA; SADON, RON; MCCOURT, TRACY ON 09/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PUCKETT, LINDA; SADON, RON; MCCOURT, TRACY ON 09/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY PUCKETT, LINDA; SADON, RON; MCCOURT, TRACY; REYNOLDS, DIANA ON 09/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENSIGN SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where THE ENSIGN GROUP INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORAN LAW