This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 01/10/2023 at 06:41:19 (UTC).

LINDA PARISI VS. MONTAGE HOTELS & RESORTS, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 LINDA PARISI filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MONTAGE HOTELS RESORTS, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Linda Parisi

Defendants

MONTAGE LAGUNA BEACH, LLC

Montage Hotels & Resorts, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Roberts Jeandron Law

Defendant Attorney

Law Office of Tracey Lazarus

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY PARISI, LINDA ON 01/18/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY PARISI, LINDA ON 01/18/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PARISI, LINDA ON 01/18/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PARISI, LINDA ON 01/18/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PARISI, LINDA ON 01/18/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PARISI, LINDA ON 01/18/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12995647 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12823566.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12995647 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12823566.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/23/2022 AT 01:30:00 PM IN W15 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/23/2022 AT 01:30:00 PM IN W15 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PARISI, LINDA ON 01/27/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PARISI, LINDA ON 01/27/2022

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY PARISI, LINDA ON 02/23/2022

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY PARISI, LINDA ON 02/23/2022

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY MONTAGE HOTELS & RESORTS, LLC; MONTAGE LAGUNA BEACH, LLC ON 03/24/2022

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY MONTAGE HOTELS & RESORTS, LLC; MONTAGE LAGUNA BEACH, LLC ON 03/24/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13025861 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12853839.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13025861 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12853839.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PARISI, LINDA ON 06/07/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PARISI, LINDA ON 06/07/2022

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY PARISI, LINDA ON 06/07/2022

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY PARISI, LINDA ON 06/07/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13059587 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12887588.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13059587 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12887588.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY MONTAGE HOTELS & RESORTS, LLC ON 06/21/2022

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY MONTAGE HOTELS & RESORTS, LLC ON 06/21/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13066181 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12894174.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13066181 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12894174.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MONTAGE HOTELS & RESORTS, LLC ON 06/21/2022

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MONTAGE HOTELS & RESORTS, LLC ON 06/21/2022

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/23/2022 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/23/2022 01:30:00 PM.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2023
  • HearingDescription: JURY TRIAL; Judge: LEE; Department: W15

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 06/23/2022 01:30:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketTHE JURY TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 04/17/2023 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT W15.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/17/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN W15 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY MONTAGE HOTELS & RESORTS, LLC ON 06/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21174143 RECEIVED ON 06/21/2022 05:02:55 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13066181 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12894174.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY MONTAGE HOTELS & RESORTS, LLC ON 06/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21173952 RECEIVED ON 06/21/2022 01:55:42 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13059587 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12887588.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21126134 RECEIVED ON 02/23/2022 02:43:48 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PARISI, LINDA ON 01/27/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31113048 RECEIVED ON 01/27/2022 12:13:57 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/23/2022 AT 01:30:00 PM IN W15 AT WEST JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEE, RICHARD ON 01/18/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12995647 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12823566.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PARISI, LINDA ON 01/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PARISI, LINDA ON 01/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY PARISI, LINDA ON 01/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21111105 RECEIVED ON 01/17/2022 02:32:23 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less