This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/12/2022 at 04:29:22 (UTC).

LINDA LEE DEVILLERS VS. MONTAGE RESORTS

Case Summary

On 01/04/2021 LINDA LEE DEVILLERS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MONTAGE RESORTS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Linda Lee DeVillers

Defendants

Montage Resorts

Brightview Landscape Services, Inc.

Brightview Landscapes LLC

DTRS MLB, LLC

Montage Hotels & Resorts, LLC

Cross Defendant and Defendant

Brightview Landscape Services, Inc.

Others and Defendants

DTRS MLB, LLC

Montage Hotels & Resorts, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Majid Foroozandeh

Defendant and Other Attorneys

Manning & Kass Ellrod, Ramirez, Trester LLP

Law Office of Tracey Lazarus

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13006526 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12834478.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13006526 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12834478.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY DTRS MLB, LLC; MONTAGE HOTELS & RESORTS, LLC ON 02/09/2022

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY DTRS MLB, LLC; MONTAGE HOTELS & RESORTS, LLC ON 02/09/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12937357 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12765265.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12937357 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12765265.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY MONTAGE HOTELS & RESORTS, LLC ON 08/31/2021

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY MONTAGE HOTELS & RESORTS, LLC ON 08/31/2021

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY DTRS MLB, LLC ON 08/31/2021

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY DTRS MLB, LLC ON 08/31/2021

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DTRS MLB, LLC; MONTAGE HOTELS & RESORTS, LLC ON 08/31/2021

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DTRS MLB, LLC; MONTAGE HOTELS & RESORTS, LLC ON 08/31/2021

NOTICE OF RELOCATION

NOTICE OF RELOCATION

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12917661 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12745521.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12917661 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12745521.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPES LLC ON 07/21/2021

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY BRIGHTVIEW LANDSCAPES LLC ON 07/21/2021

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY DEVILLERS, LINDA LEE ON 04/16/2021

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY DEVILLERS, LINDA LEE ON 04/16/2021

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 2) FILED BY DEVILLERS, LINDA LEE ON 03/25/2021

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 2) FILED BY DEVILLERS, LINDA LEE ON 03/25/2021

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 1) FILED BY DEVILLERS, LINDA LEE ON 03/25/2021

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 1) FILED BY DEVILLERS, LINDA LEE ON 03/25/2021

JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 05/09/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C22 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 05/09/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C22 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY DEVILLERS, LINDA LEE ON 02/02/2021

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY DEVILLERS, LINDA LEE ON 02/02/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12827094 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12654272.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12827094 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12654272.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DEVILLERS, LINDA LEE ON 01/04/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DEVILLERS, LINDA LEE ON 01/04/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DEVILLERS, LINDA LEE ON 01/04/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DEVILLERS, LINDA LEE ON 01/04/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY DEVILLERS, LINDA LEE ON 01/04/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY DEVILLERS, LINDA LEE ON 01/04/2021

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2022
  • HearingDescription: JURY TRIAL; Judge: SALTER; Department: N06

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13006526 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12834478.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1950275 RECEIVED ON 02/09/2022 06:17:51 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY DTRS MLB, LLC; MONTAGE HOTELS & RESORTS, LLC ON 02/09/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12937357 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12765265.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21059633 RECEIVED ON 08/31/2021 09:44:32 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY MONTAGE HOTELS & RESORTS, LLC ON 08/31/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY DTRS MLB, LLC ON 08/31/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY DTRS MLB, LLC; MONTAGE HOTELS & RESORTS, LLC ON 08/31/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELOCATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT (DOE 1) FILED BY DEVILLERS, LINDA LEE ON 03/25/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 05/09/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C22 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY DEVILLERS, LINDA LEE ON 02/02/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2980463 RECEIVED ON 02/02/2021 03:04:25 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SALTER, GLENN ON 01/04/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12827094 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12654272.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DEVILLERS, LINDA LEE ON 01/04/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DEVILLERS, LINDA LEE ON 01/04/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY DEVILLERS, LINDA LEE ON 01/04/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1799646 RECEIVED ON 01/04/2021 01:28:36 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less