This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/07/2022 at 06:47:23 (UTC).

LINDA CARTER VS. ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY

Case Summary

On 12/23/2021 LINDA CARTER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ORANGE COUNTY TRANSPORTATION AUTHORITY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Linda Carter

Defendant

Orange County Transportation Authority

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF KATHERINE LIPEL

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY CARTER, LINDA ON 12/23/2021

COMPLAINT FILED BY CARTER, LINDA ON 12/23/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CARTER, LINDA ON 12/23/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CARTER, LINDA ON 12/23/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CARTER, LINDA ON 12/23/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CARTER, LINDA ON 12/23/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12987463 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12815402.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12987463 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12815402.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/25/2022 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/25/2022 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CARTER, LINDA ON 01/25/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CARTER, LINDA ON 01/25/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: GEORGE; Department: C24

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CARTER, LINDA ON 01/25/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1943643 RECEIVED ON 01/25/2022 12:52:21 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/25/2022 AT 10:00:00 AM IN C24 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12987463 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12815402.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31100777 RECEIVED ON 12/23/2021 12:02:05 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GEORGE, STEPHANIE ON 12/23/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CARTER, LINDA ON 12/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CARTER, LINDA ON 12/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY CARTER, LINDA ON 12/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Orange County Transportation Authority is a litigant