This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 03:27:05 (UTC).

LEYE PROPERTIES, LLC VS. MICHELLE BRECEDA

Case Summary

On 01/12/2016 LEYE PROPERTIES, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MICHELLE BRECEDA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEYE PROPERTIES, LLC

Defendants

JILLIAN JONES

MICHELLE BRECEDA

CAIN MUNOZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF CHING C LIM

 

Court Documents

WRIT ISSUED

WRIT ISSUED

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY LEYE PROPERTIES, LLC ON 02/22/2016

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY LEYE PROPERTIES, LLC ON 02/22/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11923436 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11747641.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11923436 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11747641.

WRIT RECEIVED ON 02/18/2016.

WRIT RECEIVED ON 02/18/2016.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY LEYE PROPERTIES, LLC ON 02/18/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY LEYE PROPERTIES, LLC ON 02/18/2016

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 02/18/2016.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 02/18/2016.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR NUNC PRO TUNC MINUTES 02/19/2016 11:38:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR NUNC PRO TUNC MINUTES 02/19/2016 11:38:00 AM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR NUNC PRO TUNC MINUTES 02/18/2016 12:43:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR NUNC PRO TUNC MINUTES 02/18/2016 12:43:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 02/18/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 02/18/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) FILED BY LEYE PROPERTIES, LLC ON 02/16/2016

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (SUMMARY) FILED BY LEYE PROPERTIES, LLC ON 02/16/2016

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 02/16/2016.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 02/16/2016.

TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY LEYE PROPERTIES, LLC ON 02/16/2016

TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY LEYE PROPERTIES, LLC ON 02/16/2016

TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY LEYE PROPERTIES, LLC ON 02/16/2016

TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY LEYE PROPERTIES, LLC ON 02/16/2016

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 02/18/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 02/18/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN N10 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 5-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY LEYE PROPERTIES, LLC ON 01/29/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 5-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY LEYE PROPERTIES, LLC ON 01/29/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 5-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY LEYE PROPERTIES, LLC ON 01/29/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 5-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY LEYE PROPERTIES, LLC ON 01/29/2016

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY LEYE PROPERTIES, LLC ON 02/22/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY RAPIDLEGAL FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11923436 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11747641.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT RECEIVED ON 02/18/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY LEYE PROPERTIES, LLC ON 02/18/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 02/18/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2444616 RECEIVED ON 02/18/2016 03:52:53 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2016
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY BRECEDA, MICHELLE ON 01/21/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • DocketMUNOZ, CAIN REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 01/21/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY MUNOZ, CAIN ON 01/21/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY JONES, JILLIAN; BRECEDA, MICHELLE; MUNOZ, CAIN ON 01/21/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11904191 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11728407.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LEYE PROPERTIES, LLC ON 01/12/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LEYE PROPERTIES, LLC ON 01/12/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY LEYE PROPERTIES, LLC ON 01/12/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4488386 RECEIVED ON 01/12/2016 09:48:15 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less