This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 06/19/2021 at 06:55:44 (UTC).

LEXINGTON NATIONAL INSURANCE CORPORATION VS. BROWNDORF, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/06/2021 LEXINGTON NATIONAL INSURANCE CORPORATION filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against BROWNDORF. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lexington National Insurance Corporation

Defendants

DCM-P1, LLC

Matthew C. Browndorf

Plutos Sama Holdings, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Roxborough, Pomerance, Nye & Adreani, LLP

Other Attorneys

ROXBOROUGH, POMERANCE, NYE & ADREANI,

 

Court Documents

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY LEXINGTON NATIONAL INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 06/16/2021

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY LEXINGTON NATIONAL INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 06/16/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY LEXINGTON NATIONAL INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 04/22/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY LEXINGTON NATIONAL INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 04/22/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY LEXINGTON NATIONAL INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 04/22/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY LEXINGTON NATIONAL INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 04/22/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY LEXINGTON NATIONAL INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 04/14/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY LEXINGTON NATIONAL INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 04/14/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY LEXINGTON NATIONAL INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 04/14/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY LEXINGTON NATIONAL INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 04/14/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12869902 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12697561.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12869902 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12697561.

DOCUMENT - OTHER (RE: SISTER STATE JUDGMENT) FILED BY LEXINGTON NATIONAL INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 04/06/2021

DOCUMENT - OTHER (RE: SISTER STATE JUDGMENT) FILED BY LEXINGTON NATIONAL INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 04/06/2021

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 04/08/2021) RECEIVED ON 04/06/2021.

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 04/08/2021) RECEIVED ON 04/06/2021.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LEXINGTON NATIONAL INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 04/06/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LEXINGTON NATIONAL INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 04/06/2021

APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT FILED BY LEXINGTON NATIONAL INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 04/06/2021

APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT FILED BY LEXINGTON NATIONAL INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 04/06/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT FILED BY LEXINGTON NATIONAL INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 06/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1859827 RECEIVED ON 06/16/2021 02:14:08 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY LEXINGTON NATIONAL INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 04/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31007098 RECEIVED ON 04/22/2021 03:03:10 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY LEXINGTON NATIONAL INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 04/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41184980 RECEIVED ON 04/22/2021 01:41:11 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY LEXINGTON NATIONAL INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 04/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41181548 RECEIVED ON 04/14/2021 12:25:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY LEXINGTON NATIONAL INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 04/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21006660 RECEIVED ON 04/14/2021 12:24:46 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12869902 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12697561.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31000199 RECEIVED ON 04/06/2021 12:05:32 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF SISTER STATE JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF SISTER STATE JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketTHE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT AS TO APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDOCUMENT - OTHER (RE: SISTER STATE JUDGMENT) FILED BY LEXINGTON NATIONAL INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 04/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT (ISSUED ON 04/08/2021) RECEIVED ON 04/06/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LEXINGTON NATIONAL INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 04/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT ON SISTER-STATE JUDGMENT FILED BY LEXINGTON NATIONAL INSURANCE CORPORATION ON 04/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DCM-P1 is a litigant

Latest cases where Plutos Sama Holdings, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Lexington National Ins Corp is a litigant