This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/14/2022 at 04:38:45 (UTC).

LES DRUCKER VS. HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA

Case Summary

On 07/21/2022 LES DRUCKER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Les Drucker

Defendant

Hyundai Motor America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Neale & Fhima APC

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/23/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/23/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13080872 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12908861.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13080872 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12908861.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DRUCKER, LES ON 07/21/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DRUCKER, LES ON 07/21/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DRUCKER, LES ON 07/21/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DRUCKER, LES ON 07/21/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY DRUCKER, LES ON 07/21/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY DRUCKER, LES ON 07/21/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY DRUCKER, LES ON 07/26/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY DRUCKER, LES ON 07/26/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: SERVINO; Department: C21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21188435 RECEIVED ON 07/26/2022 04:38:49 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY DRUCKER, LES ON 07/26/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11015934 RECEIVED ON 07/21/2022 04:20:31 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13080872 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12908861.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/23/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C21 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY DRUCKER, LES ON 07/21/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY DRUCKER, LES ON 07/21/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY DRUCKER, LES ON 07/21/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SERVINO, DEBORAH ON 07/21/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HYUNDAI MOTOR AMERICA is a litigant