This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 06:49:49 (UTC).

LEONOR SOSA VS. FUTURE FOAM, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/31/2019 LEONOR SOSA filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against FUTURE FOAM, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEONOR SOSA

Defendants

EMPLOYBRIDGE, LLC

FUTURE FOAM, INC.

Real Time Staffing Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF NICHOLAS CAMERON & ASSOCIATES

Defendant Attorney

Swerdlow Florence Sanchez Swerdlow & Wimmer

Other Attorneys

SWERDLOW FLORENCE SANCHEZ SWERDLOW & W

LAW OFFICES OF NICHOLAS CAMERON & ASSO

 

Court Documents

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4968388 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4968388 REJECTED.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO STAY JUDICIAL CASE) FILED BY SOSA, LEONOR ON 06/11/2019

STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO STAY JUDICIAL CASE) FILED BY SOSA, LEONOR ON 06/11/2019

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/10/2019

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/10/2019

OPPOSITION FILED BY SOSA, LEONOR ON 06/07/2019

OPPOSITION FILED BY SOSA, LEONOR ON 06/07/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12554450 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12378335.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12554450 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12378335.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY EMPLOYBRIDGE, LLC; REAL TIME STAFFING SERVICES, LLC ON 05/10/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY EMPLOYBRIDGE, LLC; REAL TIME STAFFING SERVICES, LLC ON 05/10/2019

DOCUMENT - OTHER FILED BY EMPLOYBRIDGE, LLC; REAL TIME STAFFING SERVICES, LLC ON 05/10/2019

DOCUMENT - OTHER FILED BY EMPLOYBRIDGE, LLC; REAL TIME STAFFING SERVICES, LLC ON 05/10/2019

MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION FILED BY EMPLOYBRIDGE, LLC; REAL TIME STAFFING SERVICES, LLC ON 05/10/2019

MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION FILED BY EMPLOYBRIDGE, LLC; REAL TIME STAFFING SERVICES, LLC ON 05/10/2019

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/10/2019

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/10/2019

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 05/09/2019 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 05/09/2019 09:00:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12549055 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12372934.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12549055 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12372934.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY SOSA, LEONOR ON 05/08/2019

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY SOSA, LEONOR ON 05/08/2019

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) (ADDITIONAL COURT FEES) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 04/23/2019

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) (ADDITIONAL COURT FEES) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 04/23/2019

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 04/18/2019.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 04/18/2019.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SOSA, LEONOR ON 04/18/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SOSA, LEONOR ON 04/18/2019

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY SOSA, LEONOR ON 04/05/2019

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY SOSA, LEONOR ON 04/05/2019

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4968388 REJECTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • DocketADR REVIEW HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 12/12/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER (TO STAY JUDICIAL CASE) FILED BY SOSA, LEONOR ON 06/11/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1632319 RECEIVED ON 06/10/2019 05:06:43 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 06/10/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOPPOSITION FILED BY SOSA, LEONOR ON 06/07/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4978095 RECEIVED ON 06/07/2019 04:53:59 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION SCHEDULED FOR 06/27/2019 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY NATIONWIDE FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 870.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12554450 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12378335.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • DocketSOSA, LEONOR REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 02/01/2019.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY SOSA, LEONOR ON 02/01/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MCCORMICK, MELISSA ON 01/31/2019.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 01/31/2019.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY SOSA, LEONOR ON 01/31/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SOSA, LEONOR ON 01/31/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SOSA, LEONOR ON 01/31/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY SOSA, LEONOR ON 01/31/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1586440 RECEIVED ON 01/31/2019 01:20:51 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FUTURE FOAM, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where REAL TIME STAFFING SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where EMPLOYBRIDGE, LLC is a litigant