This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 03:25:12 (UTC).

LAZARO GRANADOS VS. BALBOA WATER GROUP, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 LAZARO GRANADOS filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against BALBOA WATER GROUP, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAZARO GRANADOS

Defendants

ARMANDO ESCALANTE

BALBOA WATER GROUP, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF THOMAS R. NIGRO

LAW OFFICES OF NICHOLAS CAMERON & ASSOCIATES

Defendant Attorney

JACKSON LEWIS P.C.

Other Attorneys

LAW OFFICES OF MARY E. LYNCH

LAW OFFICES OF NICHOLAS CAMERON & ASSO

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/05/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C34 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/05/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C34 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY ESCALANTE, ARMANDO ON 01/17/2018

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY ESCALANTE, ARMANDO ON 01/17/2018

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 02/26/2018 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 02/26/2018 09:00:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12279741 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12103481.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12279741 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12103481.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GRANADOS, LAZARO ON 01/12/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GRANADOS, LAZARO ON 01/12/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GRANADOS, LAZARO ON 01/12/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY GRANADOS, LAZARO ON 01/12/2018

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY GRANADOS, LAZARO; GRANADOS, LAZARO ON 01/16/2018

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY GRANADOS, LAZARO; GRANADOS, LAZARO ON 01/16/2018

COMPLAINT FILED BY GRANADOS, LAZARO ON 10/10/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY GRANADOS, LAZARO ON 10/10/2017

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE FILED BY GRANADOS, LAZARO ON 01/12/2018

DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE FILED BY GRANADOS, LAZARO ON 01/12/2018

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY BALBOA WATER GROUP, LLC ON 01/17/2018

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY BALBOA WATER GROUP, LLC ON 01/17/2018

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GRANADOS, LAZARO ON 10/10/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GRANADOS, LAZARO ON 10/10/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12321707 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12145479.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12321707 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12145479.

DECLARATION - OTHER (AUTHORIZING PAYMENT OF WAIVED COURT FILING FEES) FILED BY GRANADOS, LAZARO; GRANADOS, LAZARO ON 03/23/2018

DECLARATION - OTHER (AUTHORIZING PAYMENT OF WAIVED COURT FILING FEES) FILED BY GRANADOS, LAZARO; GRANADOS, LAZARO ON 03/23/2018

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GRANADOS, LAZARO; GRANADOS, LAZARO ON 12/28/2017

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GRANADOS, LAZARO; GRANADOS, LAZARO ON 12/28/2017

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/26/2018

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 01/26/2018

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 01/03/2018

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 01/03/2018

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2018
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12321707 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12145479.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER (AUTHORIZING PAYMENT OF WAIVED COURT FILING FEES) FILED BY GRANADOS, LAZARO; GRANADOS, LAZARO ON 03/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY GRANADOS, LAZARO; GRANADOS, LAZARO ON 03/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4828484 RECEIVED ON 03/23/2018 02:51:05 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 02/26/2018 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • THE MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 09/28/2018 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C34.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • THE JURY TRIAL IS SCHEDULED FOR 10/22/2018 AT 09:00 AM IN DEPARTMENT C34.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/28/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C34 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/05/2018 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C34 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • GRANADOS, LAZARO REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 10/11/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 10/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GOODING, MARTHA ON 10/10/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 10/10/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY GRANADOS, LAZARO ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY GRANADOS, LAZARO ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY GRANADOS, LAZARO ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY GRANADOS, LAZARO ON 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4775915 RECEIVED ON 10/10/2017 11:04:40 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.