This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:47:50 (UTC).

LAWRENCE UMEMOTO VS. WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 LAWRENCE UMEMOTO filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against WELLS FARGO BANK, N A. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAWRENCE UMEMOTO

Defendants

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

NBS DEFAULT SERVICES, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THE LAW OFFICES OF JOSEPH R. MANNING, JR., APC

Defendant Attorneys

ANGLIN FLEWELLING RASMUSSEN CAMPBELL & TRYTTEN LLP

BUCKLEY MADOLE, P.C.

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 04/27/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 04/27/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY NBS DEFAULT SERVICES, LLC ON 03/30/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY NBS DEFAULT SERVICES, LLC ON 03/30/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11939165 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11763354.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11939165 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11763354.

DECLARATION RE: EX-PARTE NOTICE FILED BY UMEMOTO, LAWRENCE ON 03/03/2016

DECLARATION RE: EX-PARTE NOTICE FILED BY UMEMOTO, LAWRENCE ON 03/03/2016

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/03/2016

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/03/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11930284 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11754484.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11930284 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11754484.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY UMEMOTO, LAWRENCE ON 03/09/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY UMEMOTO, LAWRENCE ON 03/09/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927449 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751674.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927449 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751674.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER WILSON, PETER ON 02/26/2016.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER WILSON, PETER ON 02/26/2016.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 05/25/2016

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 05/25/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 03/04/2016 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 03/04/2016 08:30:00 AM.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY UMEMOTO, LAWRENCE ON 06/16/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY UMEMOTO, LAWRENCE ON 06/16/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY UMEMOTO, LAWRENCE ON 04/13/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY UMEMOTO, LAWRENCE ON 04/13/2016

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY UMEMOTO, LAWRENCE ON 03/03/2016

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY UMEMOTO, LAWRENCE ON 03/03/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY UMEMOTO, LAWRENCE ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY UMEMOTO, LAWRENCE ON 02/26/2016

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/11/2016

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/11/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/10/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 05/10/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 05/10/2016 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 05/10/2016 08:30:00 AM.

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY UMEMOTO, LAWRENCE ON 06/16/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4563097 RECEIVED ON 06/16/2016 02:50:39 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 05/25/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3417773 RECEIVED ON 05/25/2016 12:13:40 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • DEMURRER - OTHER SCHEDULED FOR 07/07/2016 AT 02:00:00 PM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2016
  • MOTION TO STRIKE SCHEDULED FOR 07/07/2016 AT 02:00:00 PM IN C15 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11971026 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11795182.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. ON 05/19/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY UMEMOTO, LAWRENCE ON 03/03/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY UMEMOTO, LAWRENCE ON 03/03/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3387219 RECEIVED ON 03/03/2016 10:36:33 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/03/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER WILSON, PETER ON 02/26/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927449 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751674.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY UMEMOTO, LAWRENCE ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY UMEMOTO, LAWRENCE ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY UMEMOTO, LAWRENCE ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2446733 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 02:10:01 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less