This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/12/2022 at 11:17:23 (UTC).

LAWRENCE A. KEEL VS. FCA US, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/29/2022 LAWRENCE A KEEL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lawrence A. Keel

Wenona Keel

Defendants

Antioch Chrysler Jeep Dodge Ram

FCA US, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Strategic Legal Practices A Professional Corporation

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/05/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/05/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13071767 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12899763.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13071767 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12899763.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KEEL, LAWRENCE A.; KEEL, WENONA ON 06/29/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KEEL, LAWRENCE A.; KEEL, WENONA ON 06/29/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KEEL, LAWRENCE A.; KEEL, WENONA ON 06/29/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KEEL, LAWRENCE A.; KEEL, WENONA ON 06/29/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY KEEL, LAWRENCE A.; KEEL, WENONA ON 06/29/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY KEEL, LAWRENCE A.; KEEL, WENONA ON 06/29/2022

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/20/2022 02:36:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/20/2022 02:36:00 PM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/20/2022 02:24:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/20/2022 02:24:00 PM.

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO 170.6 CCP (HON. DEREK HUNT) FILED BY KEEL, LAWRENCE A. ON 07/15/2022

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO 170.6 CCP (HON. DEREK HUNT) FILED BY KEEL, LAWRENCE A. ON 07/15/2022

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY KEEL, LAWRENCE A.; KEEL, WENONA ON 08/01/2022

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY KEEL, LAWRENCE A.; KEEL, WENONA ON 08/01/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: MCCORMICK; Department: C13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21190597 RECEIVED ON 08/01/2022 02:09:36 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER FILED BY KEEL, LAWRENCE A.; KEEL, WENONA ON 08/01/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21184292 RECEIVED ON 07/15/2022 06:25:58 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketCASE REASSIGNED TO MELISSA MCCORMICK EFFECTIVE 07/20/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketPEREMPTORY CHALLENGE UNDER C.C.P. 170.6 AS TO THE HONORABLE DEREK W. HUNT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketTHIS CASE IS REASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE MELISSA R. MCCORMICK FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/20/2022 02:24:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/06/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 07/20/2022 02:36:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO 170.6 CCP (HON. DEREK HUNT) FILED BY KEEL, LAWRENCE A. ON 07/15/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31175270 RECEIVED ON 06/29/2022 10:19:51 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13071767 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12899763.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 12/05/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY KEEL, LAWRENCE A.; KEEL, WENONA ON 06/29/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY KEEL, LAWRENCE A.; KEEL, WENONA ON 06/29/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY KEEL, LAWRENCE A.; KEEL, WENONA ON 06/29/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HUNT, DEREK ON 06/29/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FCA US LLC is a litigant