This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 09:34:30 (UTC).

LAUREN REILLY VS. CAREMERIDIAN, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/27/2019 LAUREN REILLY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CAREMERIDIAN, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAUREN REILLY

Defendants

CAREMERIDIAN, LLC

NOTIONAL MENTOR HEALTHCARE, LLC

National Mentor Healthcare, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GHARIBIAN LAW, APC

Defendant Attorney

Smith Law Offices, LLP

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY REILLY, LAUREN ON 02/27/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY REILLY, LAUREN ON 02/27/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY REILLY, LAUREN ON 02/27/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY REILLY, LAUREN ON 02/27/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY REILLY, LAUREN ON 02/27/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY REILLY, LAUREN ON 02/27/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12508785 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12332504.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12508785 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12332504.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GASTELUM, JOHN ON 02/27/2019.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GASTELUM, JOHN ON 02/27/2019.

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY REILLY, LAUREN ON 03/06/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY REILLY, LAUREN ON 03/06/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY REILLY, LAUREN ON 03/06/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY REILLY, LAUREN ON 03/06/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/12/2019 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 09/12/2019 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C11 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY REILLY, LAUREN ON 06/26/2019

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY REILLY, LAUREN ON 06/26/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY REILLY, LAUREN ON 06/26/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY REILLY, LAUREN ON 06/26/2019

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY CAREMERIDIAN, LLC ON 07/31/2019

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY CAREMERIDIAN, LLC ON 07/31/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12595931 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12420017.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12595931 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12420017.

STIPULATION - OTHER (TO DISMISS) FILED BY REILLY, LAUREN; CAREMERIDIAN, LLC; NATIONAL MENTOR HEALTHCARE, LLC ON 08/09/2019

STIPULATION - OTHER (TO DISMISS) FILED BY REILLY, LAUREN; CAREMERIDIAN, LLC; NATIONAL MENTOR HEALTHCARE, LLC ON 08/09/2019

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY CAREMERIDIAN, LLC ON 08/01/2019

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY CAREMERIDIAN, LLC ON 08/01/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12603020 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12427239.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12603020 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12427239.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12603020 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12427239.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY CAREMERIDIAN, LLC ON 08/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1650671 RECEIVED ON 08/01/2019 11:32:01 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION - OTHER (TO DISMISS) FILED BY REILLY, LAUREN; CAREMERIDIAN, LLC; NATIONAL MENTOR HEALTHCARE, LLC ON 08/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1653705 RECEIVED ON 08/09/2019 02:05:01 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12595931 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12420017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY CAREMERIDIAN, LLC ON 07/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1650289 RECEIVED ON 07/31/2019 01:40:37 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY REILLY, LAUREN ON 06/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY REILLY, LAUREN ON 06/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY REILLY, LAUREN ON 03/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3766641 RECEIVED ON 03/06/2019 10:58:01 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY REILLY, LAUREN ON 03/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3766635 RECEIVED ON 03/06/2019 10:53:30 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GASTELUM, JOHN ON 02/27/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12508785 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12332504.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY REILLY, LAUREN ON 02/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY REILLY, LAUREN ON 02/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY REILLY, LAUREN ON 02/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2767519 RECEIVED ON 02/27/2019 04:22:58 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL MENTOR HEALTHCARE, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CAREMERIDIAN LLC DBA NEURORESTORATIVE OSO NORTH is a litigant