This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/24/2018 at 09:27:55 (UTC).

LANE-PROBATE

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 LANE-PROBATE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MICHAEL LANE

Decedent

PEARL S LANE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

THE LAW OFFICES OF BRIAN S. MANDEL, INC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3551524 RECEIVED ON 05/31/2017 04:56:18 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • ORDER ON FINAL DISTRIBUTION FILED BY LANE, MICHAEL ON 07/03/2017; Filing Party: LANE, MICHAEL ON 07/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR (P) PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION 05/24/2017 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • CASE STATUS UPDATED TO CASE CLOSED - APPROVAL OF FINAL DISTRIBUTION EFFECTIVE 05/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • PETITION FOR FINAL DISTRIBUTION HAS BEEN GRANTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4728256 RECEIVED ON 05/23/2017 10:37:24 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • WITHDRAWAL OF CREDITOR'S CLAIM FILED BY LANE, MICHAEL ON 05/23/2017; Filing Party: LANE, MICHAEL ON 05/23/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1385445 RECEIVED ON 05/17/2017 12:46:22 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • ALLOWANCE OR REJECTION OF CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY LANE, MICHAEL ON 05/18/2017; Filing Party: LANE, MICHAEL ON 05/18/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 04/01/2016
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION FILED BY LANE, MICHAEL ON 04/01/2016; Filing Party: LANE, MICHAEL ON 04/01/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1314026 RECEIVED ON 03/31/2016 10:29:02 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • WILL/CODICIL FILED BY LANE, MICHAEL ON 03/08/2016; Filing Party: LANE, MICHAEL ON 03/08/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1308300 RECEIVED ON 03/04/2016 01:51:07 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • NOTICE OF PETITION TO ADMINISTER ESTATE FILED BY LANE, MICHAEL ON 03/04/2016; Filing Party: LANE, MICHAEL ON 03/04/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • (P) PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL - LETTERS TESTAMENTARY SCHEDULED FOR 04/11/2016 AT 02:00:00 PM IN C08 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 196 - FIRST PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION OR LETTERS TESTAMENTARY, OR THE FIRST PETITION FOR SPECIAL LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH THE POWERS OF A GENERAL PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE PURSUANT TO IN THE AMOUNT OF 465.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11928444 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11752662.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2446751 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 02:28:32 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY LANE, MICHAEL ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: LANE, MICHAEL ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PETITION FOR PROBATE OF WILL AND LETTERS TESTAMENTARY FILED BY LANE, MICHAEL ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: LANE, MICHAEL ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.