This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 06:29:11 (UTC).

LANDING ASSOCIATES VS. NOIL ENERGY GROUP, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/26/2015 LANDING ASSOCIATES filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against NOIL ENERGY GROUP, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LANDING ASSOCIATES

LANDING ASSOCIATES, DERIVATIVELY ON BEHALF OF LION TANK LINE, INC. AKA LION TANK LINES, INC.

LANDING ASSOCIATES, DERIVATIVELY ON BE

Defendants

LEVON TERMENDZHYAN

RANDOLPH FINANCIAL ASSOCIATES, LLC

NOIL ENERGY GROUP, INC.

SPEEDY FUEL, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

O'NEIL LLP

WEINTRAUB TOBIN

Defendant Attorneys

PILLAR LAW GROUP, APLC

WOLF RIFKIN SHAPIRO SCHULMAN & RABKIN, LLP

Other Attorneys

WOLF RIFKIN SHAPIRO SCHULMAN & RABKIN,

 

Court Documents

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2545333 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2545333 REJECTED.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/07/2017

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/07/2017

SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY SPEEDY FUEL, INC. ON 03/13/2017

SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY SPEEDY FUEL, INC. ON 03/13/2017

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 11/10/2016 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 11/10/2016 01:30:00 PM.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY TERMENDZHYAN, LEVON ON 10/20/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY TERMENDZHYAN, LEVON ON 10/20/2016

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4595983 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4595983 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4585964 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4585964 REJECTED.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12021835 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11845860.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12021835 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11845860.

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY LANDING ASSOCIATES; LANDING ASSOCIATES, DERIVATIVELY ON BEHALF OF LION TANK LINE, INC. AKA LION TANK LINES, INC. ON 08/03/2016

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY LANDING ASSOCIATES; LANDING ASSOCIATES, DERIVATIVELY ON BEHALF OF LION TANK LINE, INC. AKA LION TANK LINES, INC. ON 08/03/2016

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/03/2016

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/03/2016

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY LANDING ASSOCIATES ON 06/15/2016

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY LANDING ASSOCIATES ON 06/15/2016

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY SPEEDY FUEL, INC. ON 04/21/2016

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY SPEEDY FUEL, INC. ON 04/21/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 04/13/2016 08:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 04/13/2016 08:45:00 AM.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LANDING ASSOCIATES; LANDING ASSOCIATES, DERIVATIVELY ON BEHALF OF LION TANK LINE, INC. AKA LION TANK LINES, INC. ON 03/02/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LANDING ASSOCIATES; LANDING ASSOCIATES, DERIVATIVELY ON BEHALF OF LION TANK LINE, INC. AKA LION TANK LINES, INC. ON 03/02/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SPEEDY FUEL, INC. ON 02/19/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SPEEDY FUEL, INC. ON 02/19/2016

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY TERMENDZHYAN, LEVON; NOIL ENERGY GROUP, INC. ON 01/15/2016

REPLY TO OPPOSITION FILED BY TERMENDZHYAN, LEVON; NOIL ENERGY GROUP, INC. ON 01/15/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY LANDING ASSOCIATES ON 11/13/2015

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY LANDING ASSOCIATES ON 11/13/2015

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCHULTE, MARY ON 10/26/2015.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCHULTE, MARY ON 10/26/2015.

107 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2545333 REJECTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY LANDING ASSOCIATES ON 04/24/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1381077 RECEIVED ON 04/24/2017 04:25:33 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT 04/20/2017 01:30:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 37 - MOTION/NOTICE TO CONTINUE HEARING OR CMC IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12138859 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11962642.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY TERMENDZHYAN, LEVON ON 04/07/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4705719 RECEIVED ON 04/07/2017 03:23:40 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE (SERVICE COPY) FILED BY LANDING ASSOCIATES ON 04/07/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
189 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY LANDING ASSOCIATES ON 11/13/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY LANDING ASSOCIATES ON 11/13/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY LANDING ASSOCIATES ON 11/13/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4464277 RECEIVED ON 11/13/2015 02:33:21 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCHULTE, MARY ON 10/26/2015.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11868162 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11692360.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY LANDING ASSOCIATES ON 10/26/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY LANDING ASSOCIATES ON 10/26/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY LANDING ASSOCIATES ON 10/26/2015

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4455264 RECEIVED ON 10/26/2015 02:46:21 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less