This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/20/2021 at 14:46:36 (UTC).

LAND - TRUST

Case Summary

On 12/08/2020 LAND - TRUST was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

THE E-TAIL NETWORK, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ASSET LAW GROUP, P.C.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2021
  • HearingDescription: (P) TRUST PETITION; Department: C10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41148835 RECEIVED ON 01/13/2021 02:00:19 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING WITH PROOF OF MAILING FILED BY THE E-TAIL NETWORK, INC. ON 01/13/2021; Filing Party: THE E-TAIL NETWORK, INC. ON 01/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • Docket(P) TRUST PETITION SCHEDULED FOR 08/18/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C10 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1797222 RECEIVED ON 12/22/2020 01:03:15 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING WITH PROOF OF MAILING FILED BY THE E-TAIL NETWORK, INC. ON 12/22/2020; Filing Party: THE E-TAIL NETWORK, INC. ON 12/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • Docket(P) TRUST PETITION SCHEDULED FOR 08/18/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C17 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 199 - INTERNAL AFFAIRS IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12820731 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12647810.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2964588 RECEIVED ON 12/08/2020 11:58:01 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketTRUST PETITION FILED BY THE E-TAIL NETWORK, INC. ON 12/08/2020; Filing Party: THE E-TAIL NETWORK, INC. ON 12/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE E-TAIL NETWORK, INC. is a litigant